EP1958430 - WATERMARKING ENCODED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2016 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Jian 24514 Town Center Drive, No. 1 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | 02 /
KOCH, Eckhard Am Pastorat 11 45768 Marl-polsum / DE | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/34] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05852953.8 | 05.12.2005 | [2008/34] | WO2005US43895 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007067168 | Date: | 14.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958430 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, G06T1/00, H04N7/26 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
G06T1/0035 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (KR);
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
H04N1/32165 (EP,US);
H04N1/3217 (EP,US);
H04N1/32192 (EP,US);
H04N1/32277 (EP,US);
H04N1/32336 (EP,US);
H04N19/129 (EP,US);
H04N19/154 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/467 (EP,US);
H04N19/48 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/91 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0051 (EP,US);
G06T2201/0061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, PL, TR [2009/01] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERZEICHEN FÜR CODIERTEN INHALT | [2008/34] | English: | WATERMARKING ENCODED CONTENT | [2008/34] | French: | CONTENU A CODAGE DE FILIGRANE NUMERIQUE | [2008/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 08.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 14.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 03.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 16.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002085737 (KITAMURA SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,12,14,16,18,20,22 * the whole document *; | [X] - HUNG-HSUN LIU ET AL, "REAL TIME DIGITAL VIDEO WATERMARKING FOR DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT VIA MODIFICATION OF VLCS", PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2005. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUKUOKA, JAPAN 20-22 JULY 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050720), ISBN 0-7695-2281-5, pages 295 - 299, XP010852832 [X] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * the whole document * | [X] - ZHENG LIU ET AL, "Direct Fingerprinting on Multicasting Compressed Video", MULTIMEDIA MODELLING CONFERENCE, 2004. MMM 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 11TH INTERNATIONAL HONOLULU, HI, USA 12-14 JAN. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050112), ISBN 0-7695-2164-9, pages 76 - 83, XP010765640 [X] 24-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMMC.2005.35 | Examination | US2003179901 | WO2004006168 | - NEIL F. JOHNSON ET AL, INFORMATION HIDING: STEGANOGRAPHY AND WATERMARKING - ATTACKS AND COUNTERMEASURES, BOSTON, ISBN 978-0-79-237204-2, (20010101), pages 15 - 21, (20121107), XP055043463 | - GERHARD C LANGELAAR ET AL, "A State-of-the-Art Overview", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20000901), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1053-5888, pages 20 - 46, XP011089874 |