EP1867160 - MULTIMEDIA CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTIPLE DWELLING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHMEYER, Keith, Reynolds 6411 Columbia Circle Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | 02 /
LOCKRIDGE, Terry, Wayne 5478 Grantland Drive Dayton, Ohio 45429 / US | 03 /
DERRENBERGER, Mike, Arthur 12 Norcross Road 01748 HOPKINTON, MASSACHUSETTS / US | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
WEHMEYER, Keith, Reynolds 6411 Columbia Circle Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | ||
02 /
LOCKRIDGE, Terry, Wayne 5478 Grantland Drive Dayton, Ohio 45429 / US | |||
03 /
DERRENBERGER, Mike, Arthur 24123 Back Bay Court Valencia, CA 91355 / US | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/51] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05853113.8 | 06.12.2005 | [2007/51] | WO2005US44102 | Priority number, date | US20050668377P | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 668377 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006107350 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867160 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
H04N21/23895 (EP,US);
H04N21/2143 (EP,US);
H04N21/2221 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/2393 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIMEDIAINHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE MEHRFACH-UNTERBRINGUNGSEINHEIT | [2007/51] | English: | MULTIMEDIA CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTIPLE DWELLING UNIT | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENUS MULTIMEDIA POUR UNITE A LOGEMENTS MULTIPLES | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 06.11.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/01] | 16.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002031224 (BASAWAPATNA GANESH [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-20 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0142] * * paragraphs [0147] , [0148] * * figures 1,4-14 * [Y] 7-9; | [Y]EP0910216 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [Y] 7-9 * column A *; | [A]US6622307 (HO KESSE [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 36 * * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2004023810 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 20 - line 25 * * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 22 * * page 5, line 21 - line 37 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 28 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004172652 (FISK JULIAN BASIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0127] * * figure 4 * * column A * |