EP1831304 - HOMOGENEOUS POLYMER BLEND AND ARTICLES THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents, Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHTA, Aspy, K. 21210 Atascocita Point Drive Humble, Texas 77346 / US | 02 /
CHENG, Chia, Young 902 Live Oak Lane Seabrook, Texas 77586 / US | 03 /
DATTA, Sudhin 315 E. Cowan Drive Houston, Texas 77007 / US | 04 /
LI, Wen 4019 N. Water Iris Court Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 05 /
LIN, Chon, Y. 3811 Park Center Court Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 06 /
IYER, Srivatsan, S. 3222 Amerson Drive Pearland, Texas 77584 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Franck, Peter, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Franck, Peter, et al Uexküll & Stolberg, Patentanwälte, Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Gerstberger, Gisela, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 B-1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 05853516.2 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US44615 | Priority number, date | US20040637429P | 17.12.2004 Original published format: US 637429 P | US20050655612P | 22.02.2005 Original published format: US 655612 P | US20050655310P | 22.02.2005 Original published format: US 655310 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006065648 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1831304 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1831304 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08L2314/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOMOGENES POLYMERBLEND UND ARTIKEL DARAUS | [2007/37] | English: | HOMOGENEOUS POLYMER BLEND AND ARTICLES THEREFROM | [2007/37] | French: | MELANGE DE POLYMERES HOMOGENE ET ARTICLES REALISES AVEC CE MELANGE | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.05.2010 | BE | 12.05.2010 | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | IT | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | ES | 23.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | HU | 13.11.2010 | IE | 09.12.2010 | LU | 09.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.12.2010 | ||
LU | 09.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.12.2010 | ||
LU | 09.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
HU | 13.11.2010 | ||
IE | 09.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
BG | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 09.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
IE | 09.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
BE | 12.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
CZ | 12.05.2010 | ||
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 12.05.2010 | |
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
ES | 23.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9907788 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [A]US5959006 (PUNGTRAKUL CHALOKE [TH]) [A] 1-100* column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 11 *; | [DX]WO0001745 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0001766 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0069963 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0070134 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO02083753 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO2004087806 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-100 * the whole document *; | [DPX]WO2005052052 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DPX] 1-100 * the whole document * | Examination | - A.R. KAMDAR ET. AL., "Miscibility of Propylene-Ethylene Copolymer Blends", MACROMOLECULES, vol. 39, pages 1496 - 1506 | by applicant | WO9303093 | WO0234795 | EP1003814 | WO02083754 | WO2005051052 |