EP1828303 - HETEROGENEOUS POLYMER BLENDS AND MOLDED ARTICLES THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. A Corporation of the State Delaware 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents, Inc., A Corporation of the State of Delaware 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHTA, Aspy, K. 21210 Atascocita Point Drive Humble, Texas 77346 / US | 02 /
LI, Wen 4019 N. Water Iris Court Houston, Texas 77059 / US | 03 /
DATTA, Sudhin 315 E. Cowan Drive Houston, Texas 77007 / US | 04 /
IYER, Srivatsan, Srinivas 3222 Amerson Drive Pearland, Texas 77584 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Gerstberger, Gisela, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 B-1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 05853517.0 | 09.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US44616 | Priority number, date | US20040637429P | 17.12.2004 Original published format: US 637429 P | US20050655612P | 22.02.2005 Original published format: US 655612 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006065649 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828303 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828303 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L2023/42 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROGENE POLYMERBLENDS UND FORMKÖRPER DARAUS | [2007/36] | English: | HETEROGENEOUS POLYMER BLENDS AND MOLDED ARTICLES THEREFROM | [2007/36] | French: | MELANGES DE POLYMERES HETEROGENES ET ARTICLES MOULES REALISES AVEC CES MELANGES | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | GB | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | LU | 09.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
GB | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LU | 09.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
GB | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
LU | 09.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
GB | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
GB | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9907788 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [A]US5959006 (PUNGTRAKUL CHALOKE [TH]) [A] 1-34* column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 11 *; | [DX]WO0001745 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0001766 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0069963 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO02083753 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO2004087806 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [DPX]WO2005052052 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [DPX] 1-34 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0374695 | WO9303093 | US5298561 | US5331047 | WO9428042 | EP0629632 | EP0629631 | US5453318 | EP0400333 | EP0373660 | WO9907788 | EP1002814 | WO0069963 | WO0069965 | US6153703 | WO0148034 | US6342565 | EP1003814 | US6500563 | WO03040095 | WO03040201 | WO03040233 | WO03040442 | WO03040202 | US6635715 | WO2004014998 | WO2004035681 | US6750284 | WO2004060994 | WO2005052052 |