EP1969222 - BEARING-LIKE STRUCTURE TO CONTROL DEFLECTIONS OF A ROTATING COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Keshava 161 Natsisky Farm Road South Windsor, CT 06074 / US | 02 /
EWING, Joseph 130 Timberwalk Trail Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | 03 /
BURD, Steven 36 Renee Court Cheshire, CT 06410 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05853692.1 | 12.12.2005 | [2008/38] | WO2005US44825 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007084100 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969222 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969222 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02K3/02, F02K1/38, F01D5/20, F01D25/16, F02K3/06 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
F01D25/16 (EP,US);
F05D2250/241 (EP,US);
F05D2250/311 (EP,US);
F05D2250/34 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US);
F05D2250/71 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | F02K3/02, F02K1/38, F01D5/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAGERARTIGE STRUKTUR ZUR STEUERUNG VON DURCHBIEGUNGEN EINES ROTIERENDEN TEILS | [2008/38] | English: | BEARING-LIKE STRUCTURE TO CONTROL DEFLECTIONS OF A ROTATING COMPONENT | [2008/38] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TYPE PALIER POUR MAITRISER LES DEFLECTIONS D'UN COMPOSANT ROTATIF | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 15.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19727296 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 40 * | International search | [X]US5237817 (BORNEMISZA TIBOR [US], et al); | [X]US4969326 (BLESSING WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [A]US3892069 (HANSFORD ROBERT JULIAN); | [A]US3269120 (ANDREW SABATIUK) |