EP1828863 - MINIATURIZED FLOW CONTROLLER USING CLOSED LOOP REGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABUZ, Cleopatra 10300 Buckway Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | 02 /
ZOOK, David, J. 2540 Dresden Lane Golden Valley, Minnesota 55422 / US | 03 /
EUGEN, Cabuz 10300 Buckway Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/35] | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05853819.0 | 13.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US44992 | Priority number, date | US20040017357 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 17357 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101550 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1828863 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828863 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/06, G01N15/14 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
G05D7/0694 (EP,US);
A61B5/150213 (EP,US);
A61B5/150221 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
A61B5/150351 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
G01N15/1404 (EP,US);
G01N15/1456 (EP,US);
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
G01N2015/016 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1486 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/26] |
Former [2008/13] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRAGBARES DURCHFLUSSZYTOMETER | [2016/50] | English: | MINIATURIZED FLOW CONTROLLER USING CLOSED LOOP REGULATION | [2007/36] | French: | REGULATEUR DE DEBIT MINIATURISE UTILISANT LA REGULATION EN BOUCLE | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/36] | MINIATUR-FLUSSREGLER MIT CLOSED-LOOP-REGELUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 29.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14185056.0 / EP2829941 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AU518190B (DU PONT) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]US4844334 (HENNEL EWALD [DE]) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0890390 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-33* the whole document * |