EP1834321 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING SIGNAL INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intersil Americas LLC 1001 Murphy Ranch Road Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2014/25] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Quellan, Inc. Suite 210, 75 5th Street, NW Atlanta, GA 30308 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEBARA, Edward Apt. No. 5 301 10th Street Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | 02 /
LASKAR, Joy 860 Saints Drive Marietta, GA 30068 / US | 03 /
TENTZERIS, Emmanouil, M. 5121 Lenox Park Circle Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | 04 /
KIM, Andrew, Joo Apt. 3214 401 17th Street Atlanta, GA 30363 / US | 05 /
STELLIGA, Anthony P.O. Box 1378 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2014/02] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
GEBARA, Edward Apt. No. 5, 301 10th Street Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | ||
02 /
LASKAR, Joy 860 Saints Drive Marietta, GA 30068 / US | |||
03 /
TENTZERIS, Emmanouil, M. 5121 Lenox Park Circle Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Andrew, Joo Apt. 3214, 401 17th Street Atlanta, GA 30363 / US | |||
05 /
STELLIGA, Anthony P.O. Box 1378 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstraße 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05854008.9 | 14.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US45209 | Priority number, date | US20040635817P | 14.12.2004 Original published format: US 635817 P | US20050689467P | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 689467 P | US20050696905P | 06.07.2005 Original published format: US 696905 P | US20050719055P | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 719055 P | US20050720324P | 23.09.2005 Original published format: US 720324 P | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006065883 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1834321 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834321 | Date: | 09.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B15/00, H04B1/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
H04B1/123 (EP);
H04B15/00 (KR);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04B15/02 (EP);
G01R31/001 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | G10L15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | 22.05.2007 | BA | 22.05.2007 | HR | 22.05.2007 | MK | 22.05.2007 | YU | 22.05.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON SIGNALSTÖRUNGEN | [2007/38] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING SIGNAL INTERFERENCE | [2007/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE REDUCTION DE L'INTERFERENCE DE SIGNAUX | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 29.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13004341.7 / EP2677664 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2005 | AT | 09.07.2014 | BE | 09.07.2014 | CY | 09.07.2014 | CZ | 09.07.2014 | DK | 09.07.2014 | EE | 09.07.2014 | ES | 09.07.2014 | FI | 09.07.2014 | IT | 09.07.2014 | LT | 09.07.2014 | LV | 09.07.2014 | MC | 09.07.2014 | NL | 09.07.2014 | PL | 09.07.2014 | RO | 09.07.2014 | SE | 09.07.2014 | SI | 09.07.2014 | SK | 09.07.2014 | TR | 09.07.2014 | BG | 09.10.2014 | GR | 10.10.2014 | IS | 09.11.2014 | PT | 10.11.2014 | GB | 14.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
MC | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SI | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
GB | 14.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
EE | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
SK | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
DK | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
IT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
RO | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 09.07.2014 | |
CY | 09.07.2014 | ||
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
LV | 09.07.2014 | ||
NL | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
IS | 09.11.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 09.07.2014 | |
ES | 09.07.2014 | ||
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
PL | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
GR | 10.10.2014 | ||
PT | 10.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 09.07.2014 | |
FI | 09.07.2014 | ||
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
BG | 09.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 09.07.2014 | |
LT | 09.07.2014 | ||
SE | 09.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 09.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US5574978 (TALWAR ASHOK K [US], et al); | [X]US2004114888 (RICH BRIAN GERALD [CA], et al); | [Y]US2004053578 (GRABON ROBERT J [US], et al) |