EP1828398 - PRODUCTION OF GLUCURONO-3,6-LACTONE WITH LOW ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARGILL, INCORPORATED P.O. Box 5624 Minneapolis, MN 55440-5624 / US | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAZEAU, Brian 608 11th Avenue West Oskaloosa, IA 52577 / US | 02 /
DE TROOSTEMBERGH, Jean-Claude Kasteeldreef 8 B-3390 Tielt-Winge / BE | 03 /
HICKS, Paula, M. 11602 Tanglewood Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | 04 /
JESSEN, Holly 6618 Brenden Court Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | 05 /
MCFARLAN, Sara, C. 2151 Bayard Ave. St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 06 /
OBYN, Willy Molenveldweg 34 B-1910 Kampenhout / BE | 07 /
SANCHEZ-RIERA, Fernando, A. 14028 Vale Court Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | 08 /
SCHROEDER, William, A. 3509 Highlands Road Brooklyn Park, Minnesota 55443 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
BRAZEAU, Brian 1873 Munster Avenue St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | ||
02 /
DE TROOSTEMBERGH, Jean-Claude Kasteeldreef 8 B-3390 Tielt-Winge / BE | |||
03 /
HICKS, Paula, M. 11602 Tanglewood Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55347 / US | |||
04 /
JESSEN, Holly 6618 Brenden Court Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | |||
05 /
MCFARLAN, Sara, C. 2151 Bayard Ave. St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | |||
06 /
OBYN, Willy Molenveldweg 34 B-1910 Kampenhout / BE | |||
07 /
SANCHEZ-RIERA, Fernando, A. 14028 Vale Court Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55346 / US | |||
08 /
SCHROEDER, William, A. 3509 Highlands Road Brooklyn Park, Minnesota 55443 / US | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05854321.6 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US45575 | Priority number, date | US20040015563 | 17.12.2004 Original published format: US 15563 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006066072 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828398 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N9/02, C12P7/58 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
C12P7/58 (EP,US);
C12P17/181 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | C12P21/06, C12N9/02, C12N1/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRODUKTION VON GLUCURONO-3,6-LACTON MIT GERINGER AUSWIRKUNG AUF DIE UMWELT | [2007/36] | English: | PRODUCTION OF GLUCURONO-3,6-LACTONE WITH LOW ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT | [2007/36] | French: | PRODUCTION DE GLUCURONO-3,6-LACTONE A FAIBLE IMPACT SUR L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2007/36] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 06.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/45] | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO02074926 (CARGILL INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-8* claims 1-90 *; | [A] - C. CHANNA REDDY ET AL, "myo-Inositol Oxygenase from Hog Kidney II. Catalytic Properties of teh Homogeneous Enzyme", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19810825), vol. 256, no. 16, pages 8519 - 8524, XP002658747 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * tables I-II * | International search | [X]US2004185562 (SCHROEDER WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [Y] - CHARALAMPOUS, "Biochemical Studies on Inositol, PURIFICATION AND PROPERTIES OF THE ENZYME THAT CLEAVES INOSITOL TO D-GLUCURONIC ACID", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1959), vol. 234, pages 220 - 227, XP003023090 | [A] - REDDY ET AL., "myo-Inositol Oxygenase from Hog Kidney", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY., (198108), vol. 256, no. 16, pages 8510 - 8518, XP003023091 |