EP1828192 - DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Jun 3536 Corte Yolanda Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
GWALTNEY, Stephen, L., II 2620 Canyon Road Escondido, CA 92025 / US | 03 /
STAFFORD, Jeffrey, A. 12752 Sandy Crest Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
WALLACE, Michael B. 3766 Tomahawk Lane San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Zhiyuan 3775 Carmel View Road 2 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/16] | Duncan, Garreth Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/36] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05854475.0 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005US45769 | Priority number, date | US20040638248P | 21.12.2004 Original published format: US 638248 P | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006068978 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1828192 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1828192 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | 25.06.2007 | BA | 25.06.2007 | HR | 25.06.2007 | MK | 25.06.2007 | YU | 25.06.2007 | Title | German: | DIPEPTIDYLPEPTIDASEHEMMER | [2007/36] | English: | DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS | [2007/36] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE DIPEPTIDYLE PEPTIDASE | [2007/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 30.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP14175458.0 / EP2805953 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2005 | AT | 03.12.2014 | BE | 03.12.2014 | BG | 03.12.2014 | CY | 03.12.2014 | CZ | 03.12.2014 | DK | 03.12.2014 | EE | 03.12.2014 | ES | 03.12.2014 | FI | 03.12.2014 | IT | 03.12.2014 | LT | 03.12.2014 | LV | 03.12.2014 | NL | 03.12.2014 | PL | 03.12.2014 | RO | 03.12.2014 | SE | 03.12.2014 | SI | 03.12.2014 | SK | 03.12.2014 | TR | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.03.2015 | IS | 03.04.2015 | PT | 03.04.2015 | [2018/17] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.12.2005 | |
AT | 03.12.2014 | ||
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
TR | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
BE | 03.12.2014 | ||
BG | 03.12.2014 | ||
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SI | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
IT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
DK | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IS | 03.04.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
PL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
SK | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
RO | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
EE | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
PT | 03.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
CY | 03.12.2014 | ||
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 03.12.2014 | |
ES | 03.12.2014 | ||
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
LV | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
SE | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 03.12.2014 | |
FI | 03.12.2014 | ||
LT | 03.12.2014 | ||
NL | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 03.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03099286 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 1-173 * page 18, line 15 - page 20, line 5; examples 26-29,33,40-42,47-52; claim - * * page 3 * [Y] 1-173; | [X]DE2801289 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-173 * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; claims 1,12; table I *; | [X]WO0209716 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-173 * page 7, paragraph 2; claim 5 * * page 9, line 3 - line 8 *; | [X]GB1464248 (ICI LTD) [X] 1,15 * table 1; compounds 1-38 *; | [Y]WO2004087053 (SYRRX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-173 * figures 1-4; example -; claim - *; | [Y]DE10256264 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [Y] 1-173 * example -; claim 1 *; | [X]US3544570 (TIMMLER HELMUT, et al) [X] 1,15 * claim 1; table 10 *; | [X] - AKAHOSHI F ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacological activity of triazolo[1,5-a]triazine derivatives inhibiting eosinophilia.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19980730), vol. 41, no. 16, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2985 - 2993, XP002390903 [X] 1-173 * page 2985, column L, paragraph 1; table 4; compounds 4A,5A, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970759u | [X] - WANG F ET AL, "A novel Synthesis of Aryl[1,2-a]pyrazinone Derivatives", MOLECULES, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY PRESERVATION INTERNATIONAL, BASEL,, CH, (200405), vol. 9, ISSN 1420-3049, pages 574 - 582, XP002390904 [X] 1-173 * page 575, paragraph 1; table 1; compounds 2,2A * * page 578, paragraph 1 * | [X] - BAHAJI E-H ET AL, "STUDIES ON IMMUNOSTIMULATING DERIVATIVES SYNTHESIS OF SOME PYRROLO-1 2-C-PYRIMIDINES", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1991), Database accession no. PREV199192140000, XP002392081 [X] 1-173 * abstract * | [ ] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1991), Database accession no. BRN 5340228, XP002392082 [ ] * column A * | [X] - KOTRA L P ET AL, "4-Azido-2-pyrimidone Nucleosides and Related Chemistry", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1997), vol. 62, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 7267 - 7271, XP002390905 [X] 1-173 * compounds 11,12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo970761t | [X] - TAM S Y-K ET AL, "NUCLEOSIDES 112. SYNTHESIS OF SOME NEW PYRAZOLO-1 5-A-1 3 5-TRIAZINES AND THEIR C NUCLEOSIDES", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1979), vol. 44, no. 25, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4547 - 4553, XP002390906 [X] 1-173 * page 4547, column L, paragraph L; compound 10 * * page 4552, column L, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00393a019 | [X] - ABDEL-RAHMAN R M, "SYNTHESIS OF SOME NEW FLUORINE BEARING TRISUBSTITUTED 3-THIOXO-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-5-ONES AS POTENTIAL ANTICANCER AGENTS", FARMACO, EDIZIONE SCIENTIFICA, SOCIETA CHIMICA ITALIANA, PAVIA, IT, (199203), vol. 47, no. 3, ISSN 0430-0920, pages 319 - 326, XP008000322 [X] 1,15 * page 319, paragraph 1; compounds 2,11,12 * | [X] - BORRELL J I ET AL, "SYNTHESIS, STRUCTURE AND CYTOTOXICITY EVALUATION OF PALLADIUM(II) COMPLEXES OF 4-AMINO-3-HYDRAZINO-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-5(4H)-ONES AND 4-AMINO-3-(N-METHYLHYDRAZINO)-1,2,4-TRIAZIN-5(4H)-ONES", ANALES DE QUIMICA, (1995), vol. 91, no. 3/4, ISSN 1130-2283, pages 243 - 252, XP008000323 [X] 1,15 * page 243, column L, paragraph 1; compounds 14,15, 4 * | [X] - BUYSENS K J ET AL, "Synthesis of New Pyrrolo[3,4-b]- and [3,4-c]pyridin(on)es and Related 1,7-Naphthyridinones and 2,7-Naphthyridines via Intramolecular Diels-Alder Reactions of 2(1H)-Pyrazinones", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960701), vol. 52, no. 27, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 9161 - 9178, XP004104003 [X] 1,15 * page 9161, line 7 - line 8; compound 7E * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(96)00467-X | [X] - DONALD J DUMADS, "Total synthesis of peramine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1988), vol. 5, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4650 - 4653, XP002087391 [X] 1,15 * examples 1,19 * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1991), Database accession no. BRN 4810055,4810730,4812231, XP002392083 [X] 1,15 * column A * | [X] - LIU, GANG, "Fungal endophyte-Epichloe and its secondary metabolites", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:340837, URL: STN, XP002392084 [X] 1,15 * abstract * | [X] - MOLINA P ET AL, "Iminophosphorane-mediated annulation of 1,3,5-triazine to benzimidazole: Synthesis of 1,3,5-triazino[1,2-a]benzimidazoles", SYNTHESIS 1992 GERMANY, (1992), no. 3, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 297 - 302, XP002390907 [X] 1,15 * page 297, column L, line 2, paragraph 1; table 1; compound 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1992-26096 | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1924), Database accession no. BRN 3799088, XP002392085 [X] 1,15 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSETIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1989), Database accession no. BRN 5951213, XP002392086 [X] 1,15 * column A * | [X] - KOBE J ET AL, "The synthesis of s-Triazolo[4.3-a]1,3,5-Triazines", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (197007), vol. 26, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 3357 - 3368, XP002390908 [X] 1 * page 3362, line 10; compound XIX * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)92914-X | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1960), Database accession no. BRN 609897, XP002392087 [X] 1 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1993), Database accession no. BRN 6139401, XP002392088 [X] 1 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN CROSSFIRE INSTITUT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER CHEMISCHEN WISSENSCHAFTEN, DE, (1974), Database accession no. BRN 514343, XP002392089 [X] 1 * column A * |