EP1834502 - MINIMIZING FEEDBACK BY SENDING A QUALITY INDICATOR FOR A NON-RESTRICTIVE REUSE SET AND A VECTORED QUALITY INDICATOR FOR OTHER REUSE SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR Updated state(s): BE | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | 08.07.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPATH, Hemanth 3745 Carmel View Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
JI, Tingfang 15876 Windrose Way San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2007/38] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05855329.8 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US46746 | Priority number, date | US20040020707 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 20707 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006069302 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834502 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834502 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/08, H04L25/02, // H04L25/03, H04L5/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H04L25/0222 (EP,US);
H04W72/54 (KR);
H04W72/542 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (KR);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03802 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSMINIMIERUNG DURCH SENDEN EINES QUALITÄTSINDIKATORS FÜR EINE NICHTEINSCHRÄNKENDE WIEDERVERWENDUNGSMENGE UND VEKTORISIERTER QUALITÄTSINDIKATOR FÜR ANDERE WIEDERVERWENDUNGSMENGEN | [2014/04] | English: | MINIMIZING FEEDBACK BY SENDING A QUALITY INDICATOR FOR A NON-RESTRICTIVE REUSE SET AND A VECTORED QUALITY INDICATOR FOR OTHER REUSE SETS | [2007/38] | French: | REDUCTION DE RETROACTION PAR L'ENVOI D'UN INDICATEUR DE QUALITE POUR UN ENSEMBLE DE REUTILISATION NON RESTRICTIF ET D'UN INDICATEUR DE QUALITE VECTORIEL POUR D'AUTRES ENSEMBLES DE REUTILISATION | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/38] | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSMINIMIERUNG DURCH SENDEN EINES QUALITÄTSINDIKATORS FÜR EINE NICHTRESTRIKTIVE WIEDERVERWENDUNGSMENGE UND VEKTORISIERTER QUALITÄTSINDIKATOR FÜR ANDERE WIEDERVERWENDUNGSMENGEN | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 17.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2005 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | IE | 22.12.2014 | LU | 22.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5726978 (FRODIGH CARL MAGNUS [SE], et al); | [A]US2002147017 (LI XIAODONG [US], et al); | [A]US2003227889 (WU JIANMING [CA], et al); | [PA]WO2005043948 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); |