EP1846534 - STABILIZED IODOCARBON COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Law Department P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Lawa Department P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department, 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Rajiv R. 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | 02 /
NAIR, Haridasan K. 5032 Eastbrooke Place Williamsville, New York 14221 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, Raymond H. 5990 Hopi Ct. Pendleton, New York 14051 / US | 04 /
FORD, Lawrence A. 49 Foxcroft Drive Hamburg, New York 14075 / US | 05 /
WILSON, David P. 118 Waxwing Court East Amherst, New York 14094 / US | [2010/52] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
WILSON, David P. 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | ||
02 /
FORD, Lawrence A. 5032 Eastbrooke Place Williamsville, New York 14221 / US | |||
03 /
THOMAS, Raymond H. 5990 Hopi Ct. Pendleton, New York 14051 / US | |||
04 /
NAIR, Haridasan K. 49 Foxcroft Drive Hamburg, New York 14075 / US | |||
05 /
SINGH, Rajiv R. 118 Waxwing Court East Amherst, New York 14094 / US | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Clarke, Lionel Paul Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/43] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855525.1 | 21.12.2005 | [2007/43] | WO2005US46982 | Priority number, date | US20040638003P | 21.12.2004 Original published format: US 638003 P | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006069362 | Date: | 29.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1846534 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846534 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2205/122 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2205/126 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE IODKOHLENSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2007/43] | English: | STABILIZED IODOCARBON COMPOSITIONS | [2007/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'IODOCARBONE STABILISEES | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 17.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010522.0 / EP2287271 | EP10010523.8 / EP2258789 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.07.2011 | BE | 06.07.2011 | CY | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | LV | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | IE | 21.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | HU | 22.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
HU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
HU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
HU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/51] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HU | 22.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
CY | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.07.2011 | |
BE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LV | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 06.07.2011 | |
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DAX]JPH0959612 ; | [AX]JPH04323294 ; | [XA]JP2000309789 ; | [XA]JPH08277389 ; | [XA]WO9715637 ; | [A]GB1587907 (HERCULES INC) [A] 1,9 * claim - *; | [A]DE4116274 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FUER KAELTET [DE]) [A] 50 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5380449 (THOMAS RAYMOND H P [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5716549 (NIMITZ JONATHAN SHELLEY [US], et al) [X] 50,51 * example 13; tables 4,5 * * claims 20,30,31 *; | [A]US5744052 (BIVENS DONALD BERNARD [US]) [A] 50 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0856571 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [A] 50,66 * page 4, lines 45-49 * * page 5, lines 1,2 * * claim 2 *; | [XA]WO9948993 (IKON CORP [US]) [X] 50,51 * the whole document * [A] 66; | [A]WO0039242 (STAR REFRIGERATION [GB], et al) [A] 50* the whole document *; | [A]US6086782 (HSU JAMES T [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US6100230 (BEMENT LESLIE BRUCE [US], et al) [A] 50 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0220690 (ACM TECH [KR], et al) [X] 50,51 * claim - *; | [A]WO0240613 (SOLVAY FLUOR & DERIVATE [DE], et al) [A] 50 * claim - *; | [A]WO2004037913 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 30-34 * the whole document *; | [A]US6743765 (DOURNEL PIERRE [BE], et al) [A] 50 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004127383 (PHAM HANG T [US], et al) [A] 30-34 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005103187 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [PX] 30-39 * the whole document *; | [DAX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 19, Database accession no. 1997-209616, XP002406831 & JPH0959612 A 19970304 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [DA] 1-5 * abstract * [X] 50,51 | [AX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 52, Database accession no. 1992-427930, XP002406821 & JPH04323294 A 19921112 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [A] 30,66 * abstract * [X] 50,51 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 28, Database accession no. 2001-268131, XP002406822 & JP2000309789 A 20001107 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 50-53 * abstract * [A] 66 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 01, Database accession no. 1997-007543, XP002406823 & JPH08277389 A 19961022 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 50,51 * abstract * [A] 66 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 23, Database accession no. 1997-258998, XP002406824 & WO9715637 A1 19970501 (BEIJING INOUE QINGHUA FREEZE TECHNOLOGY) [X] 50,51 * abstract * [A] 66 | by applicant | US2834748 | US2846458 | US2917480 | JPH07220964 | JPH0959612 |