EP1833429 - PROSTHETIC SPINAL DISCS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinesse Corporation 6033 Century Boulevard Suite 1200 Los Angeles CA 90045 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Chong, Chol 2112 Century Park Lane, No. 304 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Ward, David Ian, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | Dowler, Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | ||
Former [2007/38] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent Marks & Clerk, 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855561.6 | 22.12.2005 | [2007/38] | WO2005US47025 | Priority number, date | US20040027728 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 27728 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006073925 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1833429 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2/30721 (EP,US);
A61F2/30742 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30568 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30843 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDSCHEIBENPROTHESEN | [2007/38] | English: | PROSTHETIC SPINAL DISCS | [2007/38] | French: | DISQUES VERTEBRAUX PROTHETIQUES | [2007/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2011 | 31.12.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6572653 (SIMONSON RUSH E [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * figures 2-4,11-13; claims 2-4 ** column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 14 * | International search | [X]WO2004016217 (GERBER DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US4759769 (HEDMAN THOMAS P [CA], et al); | [X]US5123926 (PISHARODI MADHAVAN [US]); | [Y]US5827328 (BUTTERMANN GLENN R [US]) | Examination | WO2004084774 | by applicant | US5827328 | US5928284 | US5989291 | US5123926 | US6572653 | WO2004016217 | WO2004084774 |