EP1842095 - ADAPTIVE SCANNING OPTICAL MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENSSELAER POLYTECHNIC INSTITUTE 110 Eight Street Troy New York 12180 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POTSAID, Benjamin, Michael 100 McChesney Ave, Apt C-2 Troy, New York 12180 / US | 02 /
BELLOUARD, Yves Burgemeester Mollaan 1 5582 CJ Waalre / NL | 03 /
WEN, John, T. 110 8th Street Troy, New York 12180 / US | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
POTSAID, Benjamin, Michael 22 Bank Street Troy, New York 12180 / US | ||
02 /
BELLOUARD, Yves 6211 Johnston Road Albany, New York 12203 / US | |||
03 /
WEN, John, T. 110 8th Street Troy, New York 12180 / US | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05855789.3 | 29.12.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005US47287 | Priority number, date | US20050647572P | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 647572 P | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081031 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842095 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, G02B21/06, G02B21/36 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G02B21/367 (EP);
G02B21/0024 (EP);
G02B26/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MIKROSKOP MIT ADAPTIVER ABTASTUNG | [2007/41] | English: | ADAPTIVE SCANNING OPTICAL MICROSCOPE | [2007/41] | French: | MICROSCOPE OPTIQUE DE SCANNAGE ADAPTATIF | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/36] | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10038622 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-29; | [Y]US2002044332 (ENGELHARDT JOHANN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2004025331 (RENSSELAER POLYTECH INST [US], et al) [YD] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004184163 (NISHIOKA KIMIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-29* abstract * | International search | [X]US2004223214 (ATKINSON MATTHEW R C [US]) |