EP1969405 - THERMAL CONTROL OF OPTICAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NeoPhotonics Corporation 2911 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2014/03] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states NeoPhotonics Corporation 2911 Zanker Road San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Ming 2809 Elsnab Court Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 02 /
TICKNOR, Anthony, J. 10952 Barranca Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
HO, Calvin 5818 Tandera Avenue San Jose, CA 95123 / US | 04 /
XU, Hao 1429 Main Entrance Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | 05 /
WEAVER, Jason 917 Del Avion Lane San Jose, California 95138 / US | 06 /
TARTER, Thomas, S. 1110 Bentoak Lane San Jose, California 95129 / US | 07 /
LAM, Jane 1487 Oyama Place San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05855994.9 | 29.12.2005 | [2008/38] | WO2005US47513 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007075175 | Date: | 05.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1969405 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1969405 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02B6/26, G02B6/28, G02B6/34, G02B6/42 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/12026 (EP);
G02B6/26 (KR);
G02B6/12011 (EP);
G02B6/28 (KR);
G02B6/34 (KR);
G02B2006/12135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMISCHE REGELUNG OPTISCHER KOMPONENTEN | [2008/38] | English: | THERMAL CONTROL OF OPTICAL COMPONENTS | [2008/38] | French: | CONTRÔLE THERMIQUE DE COMPOSANTS OPTIQUES | [2008/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 06.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.06.2013 | 19.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2005 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002159698 (LIN WENHUA [US]) [X] 1-4,10-11 * figure 1A * * figure 6A * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0108] * * abstract *; | [X]US6498878 (UEDA TETSUJI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-11 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 33 - line 41 *; | [X]EP1111418 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-11 * figure 8 *; | [X]US2004202421 (IIDUKA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-11 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0044] *; | [X]US2002035835 (OGUMA TAKEFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4,10-11 * figure 1 * | [X] - MING YAN ET AL, "Integrated thin film heater and sensor with planar lightwave circuits", SEMICONDUCTOR THERMAL MEASUREMENT AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM, 2004. TWEN TIETH ANNUAL IEEE SAN JOSE, CA, USA MARCH 9-11, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040309), ISBN 978-0-7803-8364-7, pages 185 - 190, XP010714776 [X] 1-6,10-14 * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figures 8-9 * * equations (4)-(8) * * page 189, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [X] - YAN M ET AL, "Individual control of multiple AWGs on a monolithic chip using integrated thin film heaters and sensors", 2005 OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE TECHNICAL DIGEST (IEEE CAT. NO. 05CH37672) IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,, (20050306), vol. 2, ISBN 978-1-55752-783-7, pages 87 - 89, XP010831418 [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * equation (1) * * figure 3 * | International search | [X]US5999671 (JIN SUNGHO [US], et al); | [A]US6853759 (SAMARA-RUBIO DEAN A [US], et al); | [A]US6681073 (CHAN KWOK PONG [US], et al) |