EP1807022 - VASCULAR GRAFT AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seguin, Jacques 27 rue Joubert 75009 Paris / FR | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier, et al JEANNET & Associés 26 Quai Claude Bernard 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Jeannet, Olivier, et al Cabinet Jeannet 40 rue Raulin 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 05856265.3 | 03.11.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005IB04151 | Priority number, date | US20040624692P | 03.11.2004 Original published format: US 624692 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006072835 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807022 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/856 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2002/067 (EP,US);
A61F2002/072 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0034 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFÄSSIMPLANTAT UND FREISETZUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/29] | English: | VASCULAR GRAFT AND DEPLOYMENT SYSTEM | [2007/29] | French: | GREFFE VASCULAIRE ET SYSTEME DE DEPLOIEMENT | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0722701 (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 42 - line 52 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2743293 (DENIS JEAN MARC [FR]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]US6524336 (PAPAZOLGOU KONSTANTINOS O [GR], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 25 - line 35 * * paragraph [0050] * * figure 8 * * column 6, line 47 - line 56 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 5 *; | [A]US6652540 (COLE DAVID H [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0072] * * figures 12,14B *; | [A]US6673107 (BRANDT BRIAN D [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0063] ** figures 7A,7B *; | [PX]US2005090843 (BOLDUC LEE [US]) [PX] 3 * paragraph [0068] * * figures 12,19,20 * |