EP1819768 - NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION HAVING HIGH BARRIER PROPERTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youndungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Ho 107-903 Samsung Hanul Apt., Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-707 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Minki 5-104 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Sehyun 107-303 Samsung Nareumae Apt. 55, Gajang-dong Seo-gu, Daegu-city 302-726 / KR | 04 /
OH, Youngtock 2-101 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Jaeyong 201, 723 Wolpyung1-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon-city 302-852 / KR | 06 /
YANG, Youngchul 8-104 Townhouse 391 Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Ho 107-903 Samsung Hanul Apt., Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-707 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Minki 5-104 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Sehyun 107-303 Samsung Nareumae Apt. 55, Gajang-dong Seo-gu, Daegu-city 302-726 / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Youngtock 2-101 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
05 /
SHIN, Jaeyong 30, Daedeok Techno Valley 3danji 668 Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon-city 305-509 / KR | |||
06 /
YANG, Youngchul 8-104 Townhouse 391 Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Ho 107-903 Samsung Hanul Apt., Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-707 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Minki 5-104 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Sehyun 107-303 Samsung Nareumae Apt. 55, Gajang-dong Seo-gu, Daegu-city 302-726 / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Youngtock 2-101 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
05 /
SHIN, Jaeyong 201, 723 Wolpyung1-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon-city 302-852 / KR | |||
06 /
YANG, Youngchul 8-104 Townhouse 391 Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
KIM, Myung-Ho 107-903 Samsung Hanul Apt., Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-707 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Minki 5-104 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Sehyun 107-303 Samsung Nareumae Apt. 55, Gajang-dong Seo-gu, Daegu-city 302-726 / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Youngtock 2-101 Lg Company Housing, 386-1, Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon-city 305-340 / KR | |||
05 /
SHIN, Jaeyong 201, 723 Wolpyung1-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon-city 302-852 / KR | |||
06 /
YANG, Youngchul 104-702 Parangsae Apt., Dunsan2-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon-city 302-774 / KR | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05856476.6 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/34] | WO2005KR03325 | Priority number, date | KR20040102213 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040102213 | KR20050047115 | 02.06.2005 Original published format: KR 20050047115 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080714 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819768 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08L23/00, C08J5/18, C08L23/02, C08L23/06, C01B33/00, C09C3/08, C01B33/40 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08K13/02 (KR);
B82B3/00 (KR);
C08K7/10 (KR);
C08K9/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C09C1/42 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (KR);
C01P2002/08 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K9/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/0861 (EP,US);
C08L23/0876 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/34] | C08K13/02, C08L23/00, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOVERBUNDZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHER SPERREIGENSCHAFT | [2007/34] | English: | NANOCOMPOSITE COMPOSITION HAVING HIGH BARRIER PROPERTY | [2007/34] | French: | COMPOSITION NANOCOMPOSITE PRESENTANT UNE PROPRIETE DE BARRIERE | [2007/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 09.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 23.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2007 | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6384121 (BARBEE ROBERT BOYD [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]US6407155 (QIAN GUOQIANG [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 14 * [Y] 1-16; | [Y]WO03055792 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2004106719 (KIM MYUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]US6583209 (MEHTA SAMEER D [US], et al); | [A]EP1460109 (ATOFINA [FR]); | [A]US6414070 (KAUSCH CHARLES [US], et al); | [A]WO2004005388 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US6384121 | US6407155 | WO03055792 |