EP1803206 - ROTOR OF AN OUTER-ROTOR TYPE MOTOR FOR USE IN A WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-010 / KR | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jin Hyeong, Daewoo Electronics Corporation, Legal Team 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Man Seung, Daewoo Electronics Corporation, Legal Team 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jin Hyong, Daewoo Electronics Corporation, Legal Team 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
PARK, Jin Hyeong Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Seoung Yong Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Man Seung Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | |||
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
PARK, Jin Hyeong Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 68 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Seoung Yong Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Man Seung Daewoo Electronics Corporation, 68 6 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-010 / KR | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05856480.8 | 07.10.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005KR03329 | Priority number, date | KR20040080244 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080244 | KR20040080246 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080246 | KR20040080245 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080245 | KR20040080254 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: KR 20040080254 | KR20040100942 | 03.12.2004 Original published format: KR 20040100942 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006080718 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803206 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/28, H02K1/27, H02K9/04, D06F37/40 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H02K1/30 (EP,US);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K7/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/27] | H02K1/30, D06F37/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÄUFER EINES AUSSENLÄUFERMOTORS ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR WASCHMASCHINEN | [2007/27] | English: | ROTOR OF AN OUTER-ROTOR TYPE MOTOR FOR USE IN A WASHING MACHINE | [2007/27] | French: | ROTOR DE MOTEUR DE TYPE ROTOR EXTERIEUR DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE DANS UNE MACHINE A LAVER | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 16.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2622855 (ELETTROMECCANICA OLMO S P A); | [X]JPH11137884 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]EP1055765 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [Y]US2003006665 (KIM JAE KYUM [KR], et al) |