EP1735847 - BIAXIALLY-TEXTURED FILM DEPOSITION FOR SUPERCONDUCTOR COATED TAPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Superpower, Inc. 450 Duane Avenue Schenectady, NY 12304 / US | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Xuming 65 Hillcrest Village, Apt. B3 Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
SELVAMANICKAM, Venkat 29 Francis Drive Wynantskill, New York 12198 / US | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2008/30] | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Leidescher, Thomas, et al Zimmermann & Partner, Postfach 33 09 20 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05856601.9 | 08.04.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005US11845 | Priority number, date | US20040821010 | 08.04.2004 Original published format: US 821010 | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006075997 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1735847 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1735847 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, C23C14/08, C23C14/22 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
H10N60/00 (KR);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/225 (EP,US);
C23C14/46 (KR);
C23C14/48 (EP,US);
H10N60/0632 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP);
Y10S428/93 (EP,US);
Y10S505/73 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H01L39/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIAXIAL TEXTURIERTE FILMABSCHEIDUNG FÜR SUPRALEITERBESCHICHTETE BÄNDER | [2006/52] | English: | BIAXIALLY-TEXTURED FILM DEPOSITION FOR SUPERCONDUCTOR COATED TAPES | [2006/52] | French: | DEPOT DE FILM A TEXTURE BIAXIALE POUR RUBANS REVETUS DE SUPRACONDUCTEURS | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2005 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | IE | 08.04.2019 | LU | 08.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6262375 (ENGELHARDT JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 62,63,67,68 * column 1, lines 9-36 ** column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 67; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO02056420 (IGC SUPERPOWER LLC [US], et al) [Y] 62,63,65,66 * page 7, paragraph 2; figure 4 *; | [XYI]WO02095084 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,25-27,29,30,54,55 * page 5, line 5 - page 14, line 36; figures 1-17 * [Y] 62-68 [I] 3-24,28,31-35,56-61,69; | [XI]EP1388899 (INT SUPERCONDUCTIVITY TECH [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0022] - [0086]; figures 1-9 * [I] 56; | [XYI] - XIONG X ET AL, "Rapid deposition of biaxially-textured CeO2 buffer layers on polycrystalline nickel alloy for superconducting tapes by ion assisted pulsed laser deposition", PHYSICA C, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20000701), vol. 336, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0921-4534(00)00234-3, ISSN 0921-4534, pages 70 - 74, XP004208162 [X] 1-35,54,55 * column r, paragraph l - page 73, column r, paragraph 2; figures 2,4 * [Y] 62-68 [I] 56-61,69 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-4534(00)00234-3 | International search | [A]US6361598 (BALACHANDRAN UTHAMALINGAM [US], et al); | [A]US6537689 (SCHOOP URS-DETLEV [US], et al) | Examination | WO9925908 | by applicant | - DIMOS ET AL., PHYS. REV. LETT., (1988), vol. 61, page 219 | - DIMOS ET AL., PHYS. REV. LETT., (1990), vol. 41, page 4038 | - S.R. FOYLTN ET AL., IEEI TRANSACTIONS ON APPLIED SUPERCONDUCTIVITY, (1999), vol. 9, page 1519 |