EP1766617 - OPTICAL STORAGE WITH ULTRA HIGH STORAGE CAPACITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Call/Recall, Inc. 6160 Lusk Blvd., Suite C206 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yi 12 Alaiki Pl. Makawao, HI 96768 / US | 02 /
TAKETOMI, Yoshinao 11784 Carmel Creek Road B201 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
WALKER, Edwin, P. 12 Alaiki Place Makawao, Hawaii 96768 / US | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
ZHANG, Yi 12 Alaiki Pl. Makawao, HI 96768 / US | ||
02 /
TAKETOMI, Yoshinao 10566 Giffin Way San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
WALKER, Edwin, P. 11784 Carmel Creek Road, B201 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05856751.2 | 23.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US18141 | Priority number, date | US20040868742 | 14.06.2004 Original published format: US 868742 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006076035 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766617 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/00, G11B11/00, G11B7/24 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
G11B7/13922 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (EP,US);
G11B7/005 (EP,US);
G11B7/127 (EP,US);
G11B7/1374 (EP,US);
G11B7/1395 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B7/244 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SPEICHERUNG MIT ULTRAHOHER SPEICHERKAPAZITÄT | [2007/13] | English: | OPTICAL STORAGE WITH ULTRA HIGH STORAGE CAPACITY | [2007/13] | French: | STOCKAGE OPTIQUE A ULTRA HAUTE CAPACITE DE STOCKAGE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 22.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9923650 (OMD DEVICES LLC [US], et al) [X] 33-43 * pages 21-27; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US6084846 (JORDACHE NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US6278679 (WEISS VICTOR [IL], et al) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002020821 (VAN SANTEN HELMAR [NL], et al) [A] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO03085657 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 33-43 * abstract *[A] 1-32; | [PX]EP1494229 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 33-43 * paragraphs [0031] - [0061]; figures 1-4 *; | [L] - YI ZHANG ET AL., "Towards ultrahigh-density multilayer disk recording by two-photon absorption", PROC. OF SPIE / PHOTONICS WEST 2004 ADVANCED OPTICAL AND QUANTUM MEMORIES AND COMPUTING, (20040709), vol. 5362, pages 1 - 9, XP002531271 [L] 1,2,4,5,15,18,19,33-43 * Conference Date: 27 January 2004 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.543253 | International search | [X]US6590851 (KIM TAE-KYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]US6449095 (OHTAKI SAKASHI [JP], et al) |