EP1831697 - TUBULIN ISOTYPE SCREENING IN CANCER THERAPY USING HALICHONDRIN B ANALOGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGOULNIK, Sergei 62 Wildwood Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
KUZNETSOV, Galina 28 Wood Street Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 03 /
LITTLEFIELD, Bruce, A. 4 Twinbrook Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/37] | 01 /
AGOULNIK, Sergei 91 Marion Street Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | ||
02 /
KUZNETSOV, Galina 28 Wood Street Lexington, MA 02421 / US | |||
03 /
LITTLEFIELD, Bruce, A. 4 Twinbrook Circle Andover, MA 01810 / US | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05857058.1 | 07.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US44421 | Priority number, date | US20040634734P | 09.12.2004 Original published format: US 634734 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006076100 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831697 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57496 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/37] | G01N33/574, A61K31/353 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | 04.07.2007 | BA | 04.07.2007 | HR | 04.07.2007 | MK | 04.07.2007 | YU | 04.07.2007 | Title | German: | SUCHE NACH TUBULINISOTYPEN BEI DER KREBSTHERAPIE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON HALICHONDRIN-B-ANALOGEN | [2007/37] | English: | TUBULIN ISOTYPE SCREENING IN CANCER THERAPY USING HALICHONDRIN B ANALOGS | [2007/37] | French: | CRIBLAGE DE L'ISOTYPE TUBULINE EN THERAPIE DU CANCER FAISANT APPEL AUX ANALOGUES DE L'HALICHONDRINE B | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 08.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004034990 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 34-46,48 * claim 1 *; | [X] - ZHANG ZHI-YI ET AL., "Characterization of in vitro metabolism of an anticancer agent E7389: Prediction of the potential risk of clinical drug-drug interactions.", DRUG METABOLISM REVIEWS, & 12TH NORTH AMERICAN ISSX MEETING; PROVIDENCE, RHODE ISLAND, USA; OCTOBER 12-16, 2003, (2003), vol. 35, no. Supplement 2, ISSN 0360-2532, page 184, XP009138348 [X] 34-48 * abstract * | [X] - ZHENG W ET AL., "Macrocyclic ketone analogues of halichondrin B", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, GB, (20041115), vol. 14, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.08.069, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 5551 - 5554, XP004598592 [X] 34-48 * table 1; compounds 4,9 * * page 5554, column l; table 1 * * Scheme 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.08.069 | [X] - TOWLE M J ET AL., "In vitro and in vivo anticancer activities of synthetic macrocyclic ketone analogues of halichondrin B", CANCER RESEARCH, US, http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/61/3/1013.full.pdf, (20010201), vol. 61, no. 3, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1013 - 1021, XP002335708 [X] 34-48 * figure 1; table 1 * * page 1020, column l, line 44 - column r, line 32 * | [X] - ZHENG WANJUN ET AL., "Structure-activity relationships of synthetic halichondrin B analog E7389: In vitro susceptibility to PgP-mediated drug efflux.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, & 94TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; JULY 11-14, 2003, (200307), vol. 44, ISSN 0197-016X, page 540, XP001536720 [X] 34-46,48 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9965894 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A] - KUZNETSOV G ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, no. 16, pages 5760 - 5766, XP009128436 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-04-1169 | [A] - BAI ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 266, no. 24, pages 15882 - 15889, XP008119781 | [A] - KAVALLARIS M ET AL, CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 5803 - 5809, XP008119782 | [P] - AGOULNIK ET AL, Journal of Clinical Oncology, 2005 ACSO Annual Meeting Proceedings., (20050601), vol. 23, page 16, XP008119836 | [P] - BLUM ET AL, Journal of Clinical Oncology. 2006 ASCO Annual Meeting Proceedings Part 1., (20060620), vol. 24, page 18 |