EP1824831 - HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda San Diego, Inc. 10410 Science Center Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESSI, Jerom, C. 3799 Ibis Street San Diego, California 92103 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Jason, W. 3826 Dixon Place San Diego, California 92107 / US | 03 /
GANGLOFF, Anthony, R. 4969 Dick Street San Diego, California 92115 / US | 04 /
JENNINGS, Andrew, J. 3541 Curlew Street San Diego, California 92103 / US | 05 /
KALDOR, Stephen, W. 4887 Del Mar Mesa Road San Diego, California 92130 / US | 06 /
SKENE, Robert, J. 1291 Elfin Forest Road East San Marcos, California 92078 / US | 07 /
STAFFORD, Jeffrey, A. 12752 Sandy Crest Court San Diego, California 92130 / US | 08 /
VU, Phong, H. 7272 Arroyo Grande Road San Diego, California 92129 / US | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05857114.2 | 16.12.2005 | [2007/35] | WO2005US45779 | Priority number, date | US20040636974P | 16.12.2004 Original published format: US 636974 P | [2007/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006066133 | Date: | 22.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1824831 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D235/06, C07D235/26, C07D233/32, C07D263/58, C07D277/68, C07D235/30, C07D471/04, C07D235/28, C07D277/70, C07D401/12, C07D401/04, C07D409/06, C07D409/04, C07D403/04, C07D405/04 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
C07D235/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
C07D235/26 (EP,US);
C07D263/38 (EP,US);
C07D263/58 (EP,US);
C07D277/68 (EP,US);
C07D277/72 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HISTONDEACETYLASE-INHIBITOREN | [2007/35] | English: | HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS | [2007/35] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DESACETYLASE | [2007/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 24.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03092686 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [XY] 1-52 * Title; abstract; page 1, lines 10-13; claims; page 34, table 1, compound entry 3; table 3, page 47, compound entry 19; table 4, page 53, compound entry 30. *; | [XY]WO2004069803 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [XY] 1-52 * Page 2, paragraph 2; claims; pages 10, 32: example 1-22; pages 18, 41: example 4-9. *; | [XY]WO2004052838 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [XY] 1-52 * Page 2, lines 25-28; claims; page 38, example 6-10; page 39, example 6-20; page 43, example 6-41. *; | [XY]EP0847992 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [XY] 1-52 * Abstract; page 3, lines 32-33; claims; page 69, example 99; pages 82-83, example 145. *; | [XY]WO2004058234 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [XY] 1-52 * Page 190, line 9 to page 196, line 1; claims; page 38, lines 23-28; page 38, line 30 to page 43, compounds II; page 44-50, compounds IIa; page 55, compound 47; pages 149, 186, examples 99, 145. *; | [X]US2004142953 (DELORME DANIEL [CA], et al) [X] 1-52 * Abstract; page 28, [0155]-[0163], compounds (3); pages 75-76, [0242]; page 140, example 92. * |