EP1844121 - MODIFIED LATEX DRAG REDUCER AND PROCESSES THEREFOR AND THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford (77079-1175) P.O. Box 4783 Houston, Texas 77210-4783 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford (77079-1175) P.O. Box 4783 Houston, Texas 77210-4783 / US | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Houston, TX 77079 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARRIS, William, F. 130 Elmwood Avenue Ponca City, Oklahoma 74601 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Kenneth, W. 302 N. Main Tonkawa, Oklahoma 74653 / US | 03 /
MILLIGAN, Stuart, N. 3925 Overcrest Road Ponca City, Oklahoma 74604 / US | 04 /
JOHNSTON, Ray, L. 800 Michael Lane Ponca City, Oklahoma 74604 / US | 05 /
ANDERSON, Vincent, S. 2837 Indian Hills Road Ponca City, Oklahoma 74604 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Simpson, Paul Christopher ConocoPhillips (U.K.) Limited Legal Floor 6, Portman House 2 Portman Street London, Greater London W1H 6DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Simpson, Paul Christopher ConocoPhillips Limited Downstream Legal Portman House 2 Portman Street London W1H 6DU / GB | ||
Former [2010/44] | Simpson, Paul Christopher ConocoPhilips Limited Portman House 2 Portman Street London W1H 6DU / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Bublak, Wolfgang European Patent Attorney Bardehle, Pagenberg, Dost, Altenburg, Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05857132.4 | 19.12.2005 | [2007/42] | WO2005US45974 | Priority number, date | US20040026758 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 26758 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006081010 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844121 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844121 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F17D1/17 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
F17D1/17 (EP,BR,NO,US);
C09K3/00 (NO);
C09K2208/28 (EP,BR,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/42] | C09K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTER LATEX ALS STRÖMUNGSWIDERSTANDVERMINDERER UND SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/42] | English: | MODIFIED LATEX DRAG REDUCER AND PROCESSES THEREFOR AND THEREWITH | [2007/42] | French: | REDUCTEUR DE TRAINEE DE LATEX MODIFIE ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 14.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12152173.6 / EP2447594 | EP12181641.7 / EP2527714 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9732926 (CONOCO INC [US]) [Y] 1,5 * page 1, lines 5-10; figures 1,2; claims 1,9; tables 5,6 * * page 25, line 15 - page 28, line 35 ** the whole document *; | [XY]EP0882739 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 4, lines 25-52 * * page 5, lines 14 - 18 * * page 8, lines 3-5 * * page 8, lines 29-37 * * the whole document * [Y] 1,5 | International search | [X]EP0882739 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) | by applicant | WO9732926 | EP0882739 | - W.C. GRIFFIN, J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1949), vol. 1, page 311 | - J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1954), vol. 5, page 249 |