EP1831380 - NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENES FROM PLANTS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Plant Science GmbH Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2007/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAERTEL, Heiko 24 Chestnut Bluffs Lane Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US | 02 /
GIBSON, Jermaine 5538 Hamstead Crossing Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27612 / US | 03 /
REN, Peifeng 206 Wedgemere Street Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Popp, Andreas BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Popp, Andreas BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05857138.1 | 19.12.2005 | [2007/37] | WO2005US46027 | Priority number, date | US20040637531P | 20.12.2004 Original published format: US 637531 P | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006073787 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1831380 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N9/02, A01H5/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/8247 (EP,US);
C12N15/8218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE ZUR KODIERUNG PFLANZLICHER FETTSÄUREDESATURASE-GENE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2007/37] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES ENCODING FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENES FROM PLANTS AND METHODS OF USE | [2007/37] | French: | MOLECULES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT POUR DES GENES DE DESATURASE D'ACIDES GRAS PROVENANT DE PLANTES ET LEURS PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2007/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP08162569.1 / EP2163638 | EP09176481.1 / EP2180056 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0794250 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al) [X] 1-12,16-21 * figures 2,5; sequences 1-4 *; | [X]WO9856922 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16-21 * figure 1; examples 5-8; sequences 3,4 *; | [X]WO0125453 (CA MINISTER AGRICULTURE & FOOD [CA], et al) [X] 1-12,16-21 * page 62 - page 63; figure 9 *; | [X]WO0185968 (BIORIGINAL FOOD & SCIENCE CORP [CA]) [X] 1-12,16-21 * figures 1,3; example 4; sequences 3,4 *; | [X] - ISAACSON T ET AL, "Cloning of tangerine from tomato reveals a carotenoid isomerase essential for the production of beta-carotene and xanthophylls in plants", PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (200202), vol. 14, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 333 - 342, XP002968365 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.010303 | [ ] - "Lycopersicon esculentum carotenoid isomerase (CRTISO) gene, complete cds.", EMBL, (20020320), Database accession no. AF416727, URL: EBI, XP002385540 [ ] * the whole document * | [X] - "Borago officinalis delta-12 fatty acid desaturase mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19980713), Database accession no. AF074324, URL: EBI, XP002385541 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - TOMITA R ET AL, "Transgene overexpression with cognate small interfering RNA in tobacco", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040827), vol. 573, no. 1-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 117 - 120, XP004536211 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2004.07.063 |