EP1718517 - TWO-WHEELED IN-LINE VEHICLE WITH TORQUE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryant, Robert 5051 116th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [2006/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/45] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/45] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05857271.0 | 07.02.2005 | [2006/45] | WO2005US03829 | Priority number, date | US20040543103P | 07.02.2004 Original published format: US 543103 P | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006009582 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1718517 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21S13/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B62K21/08 (EP,US);
B62K21/10 (EP);
B62K3/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/45] | B62M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEIRÄDRIGES EINSPURIGES FAHRZEUG MIT DREHMOMENTGENERATOR | [2006/45] | English: | TWO-WHEELED IN-LINE VEHICLE WITH TORQUE GENERATOR | [2006/45] | French: | VEHICULE A DEUX-ROUES EN-LIGNE AVEC GENERATEUR DE COUPLE | [2006/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/45] | 13.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2008 | 28.02.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2009 | 28.02.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0914848 (PROCLIMATIC DI BRUNO ANTIGNANI [IT]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,12,13,17-19 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,4 * [Y] 11,14,15 [I] 7,10,16; | [Y]US6179307 (MAO CHEN SHOU [TW]) [Y] 11,14,15 * column 2, line 56 - column 2, line 58; figure 6 *; | [XI]FR2819778 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,11,17 * page 2, line 17 - page 4, line 2; figure 1 * [I] 3,5,9,10,20; | [XI]EP1247729 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,11,17 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0032]; figure 4 *[I] 3,5,9,10,20 | International search | [A]US5160155 (BARACHET JACQUES [FR]); | [X]US6179307 (MAO CHEN SHOU [TW]) |