EP1778299 - METHODS FOR PREPARING MULTIVALENT CONSTRUCTS FOR THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRACCO International B.V. Strawinskylaan 3051 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAN, Hong 3 Barley Court Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 02 /
MARINELLI, Edmund 121 Altamawr Avenue Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | 03 /
NANJAPPAN, Palaniappa 30 Liberty Drive Dayton, New Jersey 08810 / US | 04 /
PILLAI, Radhakrishna 12 Walnut Court Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | 05 /
SWENSON, Rolf, e. 35 Fieldston Road Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
FAN, Hong 3 Barley Court Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | ||
02 /
MARINELLI, Edmund 190 Eldridge Avenue Lawrenceville, New Jersey 08648 / US | |||
03 /
NANJAPPAN, Palaniappa 30 Liberty Drive Dayton, New Jersey 08810 / US | |||
04 /
PILLAI, Radhakrishna 12 Walnut Court Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | |||
05 /
SWENSON, Rolf, e. 35 Fieldston Road Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05857561.4 | 09.08.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005US28127 | Priority number, date | US20040916155 | 11.08.2004 Original published format: US 916155 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096207 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1778299 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K49/00, A61K49/22, A61K51/08 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K49/0043 (EP,US);
A61K49/0056 (EP,US);
A61K49/223 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
C07K7/64 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | C07K1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/18] | A61K51/00, A61K49/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG POLYVALENTER KONSTRUKTE FÜR THERAPEUTISCHE UND DIAGNOSTISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2007/18] | English: | METHODS FOR PREPARING MULTIVALENT CONSTRUCTS FOR THERAPEUTIC AND DIAGNOSTIC APPLICATIONS | [2007/18] | French: | PROCEDES POUR LA PREPARATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MULTIVALENTES POUR DES APPLICATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES ET DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 28.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03074005 (DYAX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]WO03084574 (BRACCO INT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-16 * whole application, in particular Example 9, compound D16 *; | [X]WO2004064595 (BRACCO INT BV [IT], et al) [X] 1-16 * whole application, in particular Example 9, compound D16 * | International search | [A]US5580563 (TAM JAMES P [US]) |