EP1807698 - ASSAY FOR DETERMINING CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN ACTIVITY COMBINING FRET AND FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/29] | FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION ASSAYS FOR DETERMINING CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN ACTIVITY | ||
[2010/02] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Dudley, J. 11 Dunn Street Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
GILMORE, Marcella, A. 13151 St. Thomas Drive Santa Ana, CA 92705 / US | 03 /
STEWARD, Lance, E. 9 Woodfern Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 04 /
VERHAGEN, Marc 14 Thunder Trail Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 05 /
AOKI, Kei, Roger 2 Ginger Lily Court Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05858107.5 | 09.09.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005US32328 | Priority number, date | US20040948097 | 22.09.2004 Original published format: US 948097 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007001358 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807698 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1807698 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/52, C12Q1/37, G01N33/542 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
G01N33/52 (KR);
C12N9/52 (EP,US);
C12Q1/00 (KR);
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N2333/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | G01N33/542, G01N33/536 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Assay zur Bestimmung der Aktivität von Clostridien-Toxin mittels Kombination von FRET und Fluoreszenzpolarisation | [2010/02] | English: | ASSAY FOR DETERMINING CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN ACTIVITY COMBINING FRET AND FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION | [2010/02] | French: | Méthode de détermination de l'activité d'une toxine clostridiale combinant FRET et polarisation de fluoresecnce | [2010/02] |
Former [2007/29] | FLUORESZENZ-POLARISIERUNGS-ASSAYS ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER AKTIVITÄT VON CLOSTRIDIENTOXIN | ||
Former [2007/29] | FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION ASSAYS FOR DETERMINING CLOSTRIDIAL TOXIN ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2007/29] | DOSAGES DE POLARISATION DE FLUORESCENCE DESTINÉS À DÉTERMINER L'ACTIVITÉ D'UNE TOXINE CLOSTRIDIALE | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 17.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09160607.9 / EP2107112 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2011
21.04.2011
ADMISSIBLE Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2011
Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Dick, Alexander Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Bad Kreuznacher Strasse 27-29 68309 Mannheim / DE | 03.05.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.10.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 14.04.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/34] | Appeal following opposition | 12.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0660/13 | 14.05.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.07.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal | 12.03.2013 | Appeal received No. T0660/13 | 12.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2016 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/10] | 07.07.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | LV | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | LU | 09.09.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | HU | 24.12.2010 | GB | 09.09.2014 | IE | 09.09.2014 | IT | 09.09.2014 | ES | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | DK | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | DE | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
IT | 09.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
DK | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
IT | 09.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
IE | 09.09.2014 | ||
IT | 09.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
GB | 09.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
DE | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
LU | 09.09.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2004031355 (UNIV MARYLAND [US]; OYLER GEORGE A [US]; TSAI YIEN CHE [US]; FISHMAN P) [X] 1,12,15-30,33,34 * --------- * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 26 - paragraph 27 * * page 19, paragraph 65 * * claims 1,3,8-12,27 * [Y] 70; | [A]US2001046668 (LEVINE LEANNA M [US], et al) [A] 1-77 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 11; figure 2 * * page 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 18 * * page 2, paragraph 21 - paragraph 22 * * page 2, paragraph 24 - paragraph 25 * * page 3, paragraph 41 * * page 4, paragraph 50 ** claims 1,3,4 *; | [XY]WO0225284 (U S MEDICAL RES INST OF INFECT [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-69,71-77 * --------- * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 6, line 33 - page 7, line 9 * * page 7, line 24 - line 27 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 8 * * substrates (1)-(14);; page 9, line 29 - page 19, line 2 * * page 13, line 31 - page 14, line 2 * * page 14, line 17 - page 19, line 22 * * claims 1,8 * [Y] 70; | [XY]WO03020948 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [X] 1-12,15-32,35-69,71-77 * --------- * * the whole document * * abstract * * page 11, line 20 - page 14, line 11 * * page 14, line 12 - line 20 * * page 20, line 16 - line 25 * * page 86, line 3 - line 17 * * claims 18,20-24,35,38-44,48 * [Y] 70 | Examination | US6337386 | - SCHMIDT J.J. ET AL, "High-throughput assays for botulinum neurotoxin proteolytic activity: serotypes A, B, D and F", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, 2001, (2001), vol. 296, pages 130 - 137, XP002975754 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2001.5236 | - EKONG T.A. ET AL, "Recombinant SNAP-25 is an effective substrate for Clostridium botulinum type A toxin endopeptidase activity in vitro.", MICROBIOLOGY (READING, ENGLAND) OCT 1997, (199710), vol. 143, pages 3337 - 3347, XP002424472 |