EP1791701 - SECURITY DEVICE AND NOVEL ANTI-COUNTERFEIT PRODUCT EMPLOYING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRANE & CO., INC. 30 South Street Dalton Massachusetts 01226 / US | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRANE, Timothy T. 860 Crane Road Windsor, MA 01270 / US | 02 /
PREHAR, Raj Sardararam L 328, TARAPORE TOWERS Oshiwara Andheri East Mumbai 400 053 / IN | [2016/45] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
CRANE, Timothy T. 860 Crane Road Windsor, MA 01270 / US | ||
02 /
PREHAR, Raj Sardararam L 328, TARAPORE TOWERS, Oshiwara, Andheri East Mumbai 400 053 / IN | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2016/45] |
Former [2007/23] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath Ipswich Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05858111.7 | 12.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005US32501 | Priority number, date | IN2004MUM0990 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: IN MU09902004 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007001360 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791701 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791701 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1791701 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, D21H21/48, D21H21/42, B41M3/14, B42D25/355 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
D21H21/42 (EP,KR,US);
B42D15/00 (KR);
B41M3/14 (EP,KR,US);
B41M3/144 (EP,US);
B42D25/355 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP,KR,US);
B42D25/382 (EP,US);
B42D25/387 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/23] | B42D15/00, B41M3/14, D21H21/42, D21H21/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG UND NEUES FÄLSCHUNGSSCHUTZPRODUKT DAMIT | [2007/23] | English: | SECURITY DEVICE AND NOVEL ANTI-COUNTERFEIT PRODUCT EMPLOYING SAME | [2007/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ET NOUVEAU PRODUIT ANTICONTREFACON FAISANT APPEL A CE DISPOSITIF | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 12.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2016 | Observations by third parties | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 29.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10194045.0 / EP2308686 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.07.2017
04.08.2017
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Bornhäuser, Frank Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2017/37] | 14.09.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.03.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.07.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 29.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2005 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | IE | 12.09.2017 | LU | 12.09.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.09.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.09.2017 | ||
LU | 12.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.09.2005 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.09.2017 | ||
LU | 12.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | BE | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.09.2017 | ||
LU | 12.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | BE | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | BE | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | BE | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 09.11.2016 | |
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 09.11.2016 | |
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0342929 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,8,9,11,16,17 * columns 1,3 *; | [X]EP0557157 (ARJO WIGGINS SA [FR]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,11,16,17 * columns 2,3 * * column 5, lines 10-16 *; | [XA]US2003082348 (WASHBURN DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0011] , [0015] , [0080] , [0081] , [0085] * [A] 6,7,14,15,17; | [X]WO03095218 (SECURENCY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,9 * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 2, lines 23-26 ** page 4, lines 17,18 *; | [DA]WO2004025028 (DW SPINKS EMBOSSING LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1,3,4,8,9,11,16,17 * pages 1-5 * | by applicant | US4897300 | WO2004025028 | Opposition | IN990MUM2004 | DE3003281 | DE3906695 | EP0342929 | US4897300 | CA1279880 | EP0464470 | EP0557157 | US5449220 | DE19541817 | US2003082348 | EP1034331 | WO03095218 | WO2004025028 | WO2005078192 | WO2005077622 | WO2014076198 | EP2308686 |