EP1799543 - TANDEM ROTOR WING ROTATIONAL POSITION CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 12.01.2011 [2011/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHARDSON, Steven, D. 8 Lombardy Way St. Louis, MO 63138 / US | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05858416.0 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005US32882 | Priority number, date | US20040711372 | 14.09.2004 Original published format: US 711372 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007018559 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799543 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799543 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/08, B64C27/18, B64C27/24, B64C27/26, B64C27/57 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B64C27/57 (EP,US);
B64C27/08 (EP,US);
B64C27/18 (EP,US);
B64C27/24 (EP,US);
B64C27/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE DER DREHPOSITION EINES DOPPELTEN ROTORFLÜGELS | [2007/26] | English: | TANDEM ROTOR WING ROTATIONAL POSITION CONTROL SYSTEM | [2007/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE POSITION DE ROTATION POUR FONCTION AILE-ROTOR DOUBLE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 17.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 26.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | BE | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | CZ | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | LT | 11.06.2008 | LV | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | PL | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | IE | 14.09.2008 | LU | 14.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | IS | 11.10.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CY | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.09.2008 | ||
LU | 14.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.09.2008 | ||
LU | 14.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IE | 14.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
BE | 11.06.2008 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB980608 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US3636364 (STEMPLER SAMUEL, et al); | [A]US3905565 (KOLWEY HERMAN GOPP); | [A]US2004056144 (BASS STEVEN M [US], et al) |