EP1836843 - HIERARCHICAL PROGRAM GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/24] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Incorporated 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TU, Edgar A. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd. 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Davies, Simon Robert D Young & Co 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05858543.1 | 20.12.2005 | [2007/39] | WO2005IB04180 | Priority number, date | US20040021347 | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 21347 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007039787 | Date: | 12.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1836843 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
G06F16/444 (EP,US);
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F16/743 (EP,US);
G06F16/78 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HIERARCHISCHER PROGRAMMFÜHRER | [2007/39] | English: | HIERARCHICAL PROGRAM GUIDE | [2007/39] | French: | GUIDE DE PROGRAMME HIERARCHIQUE | [2007/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6016144 (BLONSTEIN STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * column 9, line 42 - column 13, line 37; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US6268849 (BOYER FRANKLIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-29* column 10, line 41 - line 64; figures 11,12 *; | [X]WO03069457 (SONICBLUE INC [US]) [X] 1-10,18-29 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068]; figure 8 * |