EP1655023 - Botulinum toxin implat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donovan, Stephen 27252 Calle Anejo Capistrano Beach CA 92624 / US | 02 /
Brady, Daniel, G. 30121 Saddleride Drive San Juan Capistrano CA 92675 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000011.4 | 25.05.2001 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | US20000587250 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: US 587250 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655023 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K38/48, A61P25/14 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | Botulinum toxin | [2006/19] | English: | Botulinum toxin implat | [2006/19] | French: | Implat d'administration de toxine botulinique | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 09.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01952135.0 / EP1289504 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010952135) is 02.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5019400 (GOMBOTZ WAYNE R [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 1-3,10 *; | [X]WO9937326 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 21, line 14 - line 30 * * page 24, line 24 - page 25, line 2 * * claims 15,17,19,20 *; | [Y] - JANKOVIC J ET AL, "Botulinum toxin treatment of tremors", NEUROLOGY, (199108), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 1185 - 1188, XP001031402 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [YD] - CLELAND J L, "Solvent evaporation processes for the production of controlled release biodegradable microsphere formulations for therapeutics and vaccines.", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS, (199801), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 102 - 107, XP001041443 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp970128t | [Y] - MAYSINGER D ET AL, "PREPARATION AND IN VIVO EFFECT OF MICROENCAPSULATED CHOLINOTOXIN", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19900915), vol. 63, no. 2, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 149 - 154, XP001041431 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(90)90165-Z | [AD] - YING M ET AL, "A single administration of tetanus toxoid in biodegradable microspheres elicits T cell and antibody responses similar or superior to those obtained with aluminum hydroxide", VACCINE, (1995), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 683 - 689, XP004057594 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)00046-P | Examination | US6063768 |