EP1690485 - Demonstration bathtub [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter+Frenzel GmbH Max-von-Laue-Strasse 9 86156 Augsburg / DE | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köstel, Peter Waterloohain 9 22769 Hamburg / DE | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | von Eichel-Streiber, Caspar Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | von Eichel-Streiber, Caspar Raffay & Fleck, Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000054.4 | 03.01.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | DE20052002310U | 11.02.2005 Original published format: DE 202005002310 U | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1690485 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1690485 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1690485 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/00, A47F7/30 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A47K3/001 (EP);
A47F7/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/33] | A47K3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, CZ, DE, SK [2007/40] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Demonstrationswanne | [2006/33] | English: | Demonstration bathtub | [2006/33] | French: | Baignoire de démonstration | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 01.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, TR | 26.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE219653 (SCHMIDT ROBERT) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2127192 (ETEZAD HEYDARI HOUCHI) [A] * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 2; figures 8-11 *; | [A]JPH08294460 (TOTO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000126064 (SEKISUI HOUSE KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19938653 (HOESCH METALL & KUNSTSTOFFWERK [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004037058 (PARK SANG WON [KR]) [A] * the whole document * |