EP1643175 - Pneumatic valve actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bürkert Werke GmbH Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | [2010/03] |
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Bürkert Werke GmbH & Co. KG Christian-Bürkert-Strasse 13-17 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettinger, Gerhard Friedrich-Ludwig-Strasse 21 74653 Ingelfingen / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000177.3 | 28.07.2004 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20031036065 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10336065 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643175 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643175 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643175 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/122 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
F16K27/02 (EP);
F16K31/1221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2006/14] | Title | German: | Pneumatischer Ventilantrieb | [2006/14] | English: | Pneumatic valve actuator | [2006/14] | French: | Actionneur pneumatique d'une soupape | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04017860.0 / EP1505325 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | [2012/30] |
Former [2012/20] | CH | 31.07.2011 | |
LI | 31.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19641073 (SONNLEITNER ADOLF HARALD [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 51; figure 1 *; | [X]US2001028049 (MAMYO MITSURU [JP]) [X] 1* page 2, paragraph 32; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19641073 |