EP1686772 - Retrieving and collectively displaying a function name and associated user data in an information terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Nariaki c/oNEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000713.5 | 13.01.2006 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | JP20050023560 | 31.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005023560 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1686772 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/247, G06F3/033 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
H04M1/72469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/15] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Auffindung und gleichzeitiges Darstellen von Funktionsnamen und entsprechender Benutzerdaten in einem Informationsendgerät | [2006/31] | English: | Retrieving and collectively displaying a function name and associated user data in an information terminal | [2006/31] | French: | Recherche et affichement parallèle de nom de fonction et de données utilisateur associées | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5848356 (JAMBHEKAR SHRIRANG N [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12 * column 1, line 37 - line 50 * * column 2, line 48 - line 62 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 67 * * column 8, line 45 - column 9, line 5 * * figures 5,5b,5d,5j,5k,5l * [Y] 2,11; | [YA]US5923327 (SMITH COLIN DONALD [CA], et al) [Y] 2,11 * column 6, line 47 - line 64 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 20 * * figures 11b,13b * [A] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12; | [X]US5943055 (SYLVAN LOREN M [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8,10 * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 23 - line 36 * * column 3, line 44 - line 65 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 55 * * column 6, line 52 - line 64 * * column 7, line 50 - line 62 * * column 9, line 30 - line 52 * * column 10, line 42 - line 44 ** figures 2,3,7 *; | [X]US2003013483 (AUSEMS MICHIEL R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0071] * * figures 2-4 * | by applicant | US5848356 | US5923327 | US5946055 | US2003013483 |