EP1691164 - Tool for inserting or removing cartridges from an ammunition belt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diller, Armin Anton-Günther-Strasse 27a 86199 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Mall, Hans Neulindacherstrasse 7 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000899.2 | 17.01.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | DE20051006061 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005006061 | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1691164 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F42B39/10 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
F42B39/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Title | German: | Hilfsmittel zur Bestückung und/oder Entnahme einer Patrone in/aus einem Munitionsgurt | [2006/33] | English: | Tool for inserting or removing cartridges from an ammunition belt | [2006/33] | French: | Outil pour insérer ou retirer les cartouches d'une ceinture de munition | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.02.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | 19.02.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.02.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CH335117 (BREVETS AERO MECANIQUES [CH]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, column R, line 42 - page 3, column R, line 62; figures 1-4 * [Y] 7; | [AY]DE1028911 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 18; figures 7-9 * [Y] 7; | [A]DE3513946 (KUKA WEHRTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 13, line 15 - page 16, line 22; figures 2-4 *; | [A]GB555099 (BOULTON AIRCRAFT LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, column L, line 18 - page 4, column R, line 3; figures 1.-3 *; | [A]US3002416 (CASLER ROGER H, et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2608900 (KUNZ) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0156983 | EP0405177 | DE2828871 |