EP1652516 - Osmotic controlled delivery of nefazodone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/18] | Osmotic controlled delivery of active agents | ||
[2010/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALZA Corporation 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states ALZA CORPORATION 1900 Charleston Road, P.O. Box 7210 Mountain View, CA 94039-7210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bhatt, Padmanabh 18385 Vanderbilt Drive Saratoga CA 95070 / US | 02 /
Cruz, Evangeline G. 3889 Blackstone Court Hayward CA 94542 / US | 03 /
Yam, Noymi 386 Dennis Avenue Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Williams, Paul Edwin, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06000991.7 | 26.10.1999 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | US19980106739P | 02.11.1998 Original published format: US 106739 P | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1652516 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1652516 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/209 (KR);
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | A61K9/24, A61K9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/18] | A61K9/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/18] | Title | German: | Osmotisch kontrollierte Freigabe von Nefazodone | [2010/10] | English: | Osmotic controlled delivery of nefazodone | [2010/10] | French: | Délivrance osmotique contrôlée de Nefazodone | [2010/10] |
Former [2006/18] | Osmotisch kontrollierte Freigabe von Wirkstoffen | ||
Former [2006/18] | Osmotic controlled delivery of active agents | ||
Former [2006/18] | Délivrance osmotique contrôlée d'agents actifs | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 24.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99971310.0 / EP1126827 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4842867 (AYER ATUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 10; example 5 *; | [X]WO9506460 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 6 * * page 5, line 16 - line 20 * * page 8, line 7 - line 16 * * page 14, line 6 - line 15 *; | [X]WO9529665 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1-9* page 32 - page 34; examples 11,13 *; | [X]WO9600065 (ALZA CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-11 * page 14, line 8 - line 29 * * page 19, line 6 - line 10 * * page 26 - page 28; example 3 *; | [X]WO9737640 (ALZA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 6 - page 7; example 3 * | by applicant | US2799241 | US3133132 | US3173876 | US3276586 | US3541005 | US3541006 | US3546142 | US3845770 | US3865108 | US3916899 | US4002173 | US4063064 | US4077407 | US4088864 | US4160020 | US4207893 | US4892778 | US4915949 | US4931285 | US4940465 | US5006346 | US5024842 | US5126142 | US5160743 | US5169638 | US5190765 | US5252338 | US5536507 | US5620705 | US5633011 | US5660861 | - ENCYCLOPEDIA OF POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS INC., (1964), vol. 3, pages 325 - 354 | - PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, REMINGTON, (1985), pages 1585 - 1594 | - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, PARROT, (1974), vol. 61, pages 813 - 829 | - CHEMICAL ENGINEER, HIXON, (1990), pages 94 - 103 | - SCOTT; ROFF, HANDBOOK OF COMMON POLYMERS, CHEMICAL RUBBER CO. | - J. AM. PHARM. ASSOC., (1959), vol. 48, pages 451 - 459 | - J. AM. PHARM. ASSOC., (1960), vol. 49, pages 82 - 84 |