EP1691135 - Device for steaming food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salvis AG Dorfbachstrasse 2 4663 Aarburg / CH | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwizer, Anton Moosacher 6264 Pfaffnau / CH | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 06000992.5 | 18.01.2006 | [2006/33] | Priority number, date | DE20051002833 | 20.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005002833 | [2006/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1691135 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02, A47J27/08, A47J27/16 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
F24C15/327 (EP);
A47J27/0817 (EP);
A47J27/16 (EP);
F24C15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/17] |
Former [2006/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zum Dampfgaren von Nahrungsmitteln | [2006/33] | English: | Device for steaming food | [2006/33] | French: | Dispositf de cuire à vapeur | [2006/33] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/47] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5075121 (DESAGE ROBERT [FR], et al) [Y] 1,6,7 * column 1, lines 42,43; figures 1,12,13 * * column 2, line 57- - column 3, line 19 * * column 4, lines 49-60 * * column 6, lines 20-25 * * column 14, line 54 - column 16, line 11 *; | [Y]DE10164237 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0022] - [0042] *; | [A]EP0071548 (JOVANOVIC DRAGOMIR) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]DE2731137 (JOVANOVIC DRAGOMIR) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1270858 (KENTUCKY FRIED CHICKEN CO [US]) [A] * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 76; figures 3,9 * * column 3, lines 116-119; figure - *; | [A]GB1220731 (WILSON ROBERT GARY [US]) [A] * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE946180 (TECHNO MEDICA MEDIZINISCH TECH) [A] * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 75 * |