EP1650889 - Light emitting element driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takauji, Toshiyuki c/o Fujitsu Hokkaido Digital Tech. Ltd. 3-1 Kita-Shichijo-Nishi 4-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | 02 /
Matsuyama, Toru c/o Fujitsu Hokkaido Digital Tech. Ltd. 3-1 Kita-Shichijo-Nishi 4-chome Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Tadao c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Ikeuchi, Tadashi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Ide, Satoshi c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/11] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
Takauji, Toshiyuki Fujitsu Hokkaido Digtal T. 3-1 Kita-Shichijo-Nishi Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | ||
02 /
Matsuyama, Toru Fujitsu Hokkaido Digtal T. 3-1 Kita-Shichijo-Nishi Kita-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Tadao Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | |||
04 /
Ikeuchi, Tadashi Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | |||
05 /
Ide, Satoshi Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001098.0 | 22.10.1998 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | JP19980067240 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: JP 6724098 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650889 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650889 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H04B10/504 (EP,US);
H04B10/07 (EP,US);
H04B10/564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Treibereinrichtung für lichtemittierendes Element | [2006/17] | English: | Light emitting element driving apparatus | [2006/17] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un élément émetteur de lumière | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98119766.8 / EP0944186 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09148630 ; | [Y]EP0740433 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 19 - line 41; figure 1 * * column 6, line 9 - line 15 * * column 7, line 22 - line 35 *; | US5914484 [ ] (TAWARAYAMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 5, line 1 - line 14 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09148630 A 19970606 (ROHM CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * |