EP1696141 - Tethered retainer assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026-1215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benoit, Thomas A. 520 Edwin Drive Bourbannais, Illinois 60914 / US | 02 /
Peek, Brian R. 19550 Everett Lane Mokena, Illinois 60448 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg) Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001166.5 | 20.01.2006 | [2006/35] | Priority number, date | US20050067195 | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 67195 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696141 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696141 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B41/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
F16B41/002 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45812 (EP,US);
Y10T292/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung mit Begrenzungsvorrichtung | [2006/35] | English: | Tethered retainer assembly | [2006/35] | French: | Dispositif de retenue attaché | [2006/35] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | CZ | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | EE | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | LI | 04.07.2007 | LT | 04.07.2007 | LV | 04.07.2007 | NL | 04.07.2007 | PL | 04.07.2007 | RO | 04.07.2007 | SI | 04.07.2007 | SK | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | BG | 04.10.2007 | SE | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | ES | 15.10.2007 | IS | 04.11.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | HU | 05.01.2008 | LU | 20.01.2008 | IE | 21.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | FR | 29.02.2008 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
LU | 20.01.2008 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
IE | 21.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
RO | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
LV | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
PL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
LT | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
IS | 04.11.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 04.07.2007 | |
SI | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 04.07.2007 | |
SI | 04.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5851097 (SHEREYK DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19737159 (EJOT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20* figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1363030 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10259976 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |