EP1686313 - Vehicle lighting device and vehicle headlight unit including the lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES, LTD. 10-18, Higashigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 144-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Yasufumi c/o Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | 02 /
Okubo, Yasuhiro c/o Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | [2011/48] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
Suzuki, Yasufumi c/o Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
Okubo, Yasuhiro c/o Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 259-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001343.0 | 23.01.2006 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | JP20050024520 | 31.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005024520 | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1686313 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1686313 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1686313 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, F21S8/10 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
F21S41/663 (EP,US);
F21S41/143 (EP,US);
F21S41/147 (EP,US);
F21S41/153 (EP,US);
F21S41/155 (EP);
F21S41/265 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugbeleuchtungsvorrichtung und Scheinwerfereinheit für Fahrzeuge einschliessend die Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2006/31] | English: | Vehicle lighting device and vehicle headlight unit including the lighting device | [2006/31] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour véhicule et unite de phare pour véhicule comprenant le dispositif d'éclairage | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4100594 (GOULD ALLAN VICTOR STEWART); | [A]US4670095 (NEGISHI MASATAKA [JP]); | [A]EP0623780 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]); | [A]DE29813531U (DOCTER OPTICS GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | JP2004071409 | JP2004095480 |