EP1683879 - Additives for suppressing tungsten leachability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Tungsten & Powders Corp. 4 Hawes Street Towanda, PA 18848 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lunk, Hans-Joachim R.R. No. 5 Box 5166 Towanda, PA 18848 / US | 02 /
Morgan, Ricky D. R.R. No. 1 Box 95C Milan, PA 18831 / US | 03 /
Stevens, Henry J. 234 S. Main St., Apt. No. 2 Athens, PA 18810 / US | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001442.0 | 24.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | US20050593536P | 24.01.2005 Original published format: US 593536 P | US20060306705 | 09.01.2006 Original published format: US 306705 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1683879 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1683879 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683879 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C22B34/36, B22F1/00, B22F1/02, C23F11/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
C22B34/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/19] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusatzmittel zum Unterdrücken der Auslaugung von Wolfram | [2006/30] | English: | Additives for suppressing tungsten leachability | [2006/30] | French: | Additifs pour supprimer le lessivage du tungstène | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS62239622 ; | [Y]JP2003211144 ; | [X]JPS5480208 ; | [X]JPS59170206 ; | [X]JPS62286698 ; | [X]US2003056620 (SIDDLE DAVID RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 8,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0279454 (HORIBA LTD [JP]) [A] 8,15 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5656791 (REESE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 8,15 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 13; claim 1 *; | [A]US4397821 (BECKSTEAD LEO W, et al) [A] 3-5,10-12,19 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 2; claims 1,4-8 *; | [A]JP2002332505 ; | [X]US4800316 (JU-ZHEN WANG [CN]) [X] 7,15-17 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 6 *; | [X]JPH05320943 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880407), vol. 012, no. 108, Database accession no. (E - 597), & JP62239622 A 19871020 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003211144 A 20030729 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 32, Database accession no. 1979-58665B, XP002392236 & JPS5480208 A 19790626 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,5-7,15-17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 45, Database accession no. 1984-278420, XP002392237 & JPS59170206 A 19840926 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN KK) [X] 1,5-7,15-17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1988, no. 04, Database accession no. 1988-025617, XP002392238 & JPS62286698 A 19871212 (HOKKAI TUNGSTEN KOGYO KK) [X] 8,12-17 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 08, Database accession no. 2003-085298, XP002392244 & JP2002332505 A 20021122 (NISHIDA T) [A] 8,9,13,15,16,18,20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 02, Database accession no. 1994-012831, XP002392245 & JPH05320943 A 19931207 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 7,15-17 * abstract * | Examination | DE78315 |