EP1666089 - Sensomotory encoder with learning capability for a neuroprosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 28.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pixium Vision SA Institut de la Vision 13, rue Moreau 75012 Paris / FR | [2013/52] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states IMI Intelligent Medical Implants AG Gotthardstrasse 3 6304 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Intelligent Acquisition, LLC 3415 Gateway Road Brookfield, WI 53045-5111 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckmiller, Rolf, Prof. Dr. Kasterstrasse 22 41460 Neuss / DE | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001551.8 | 20.02.1998 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | DE1997107046 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707046 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1666089 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1666089 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, // A61N1/05 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61N1/36046 (EP,US);
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/0529 (EP,US);
A61N1/0531 (EP,US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/23] | Title | German: | Lernfähiger sensomotorischer Encoder für Neuroprothesen | [2006/23] | English: | Sensomotory encoder with learning capability for a neuroprosthesis | [2006/23] | French: | Encodeur sensori-moteur avec des capacités d'apprentissage pour une neuroprothèse | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 18.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/14] | 27.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2014 | 25.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98913568.6 / EP0969896 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980913568) is 04.03.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4612934 (BORKAN WILLIAM N [US]) [A] 1-9,13-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0241101 (COMMW OF AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-9,13-19* abstract *; | [A]US5215088 (NORMANN RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-9,13-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9521591 (UNIV IOWA RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 3,19 * pages 21-48; figures 7,18 *; | [A]US5597380 (MCDERMOTT HUGH J [AU], et al) [A] 1-9,13-19 * the whole document *; | [XY] - ECKMILLER R E, "Concerning the development of retina implants with neural nets", PROGRESS IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS OF 1996 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING. ICONIP '96, HONG KONG, 24-27 SEPT. 1996, 1996, Singapore, Springer-Verlag, Singapore, (199609), pages 21 - 28 vol.1, XP002071155 [X] 1,2,4-9,13-18 * page 23, paragraphs 2,3; figures 2,4,5 * * page 24, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,19 | [A] - ECKMILLER R, "Biology-inspired pulse processing neural networks (BPN) for neurotechnology", ICANN '94., PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS, SORRENTO, ITALY, 26-29 MAY 1994, ISBN 3-540-19887-3, 1994, Berlin, Germany, Springer-Verlag, Germany, (199405), pages 1329 - 1334 vol.2, XP002071156 [A] 1-9,13-19 * the whole document * |