EP1777096 - Vehicle drive unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imura, Shinya, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Kowatari, Takehiko, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Tatsuyuki, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Masaru, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/25] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
IImura, Shinya, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Kowatari, Takehiko, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Yamamoto, Tatsuyuki, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Ito, Masaru, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 12F Marunouchi Cent. Bldg 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06001849.6 | 30.01.2006 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | JP20050307953 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307953 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777096 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16, B60W10/06, B60K6/04 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B60K6/44 (EP,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60K28/16 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60T8/175 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/01] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsaggregat, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2007/17] | English: | Vehicle drive unit | [2007/17] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour véhicules | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 18.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 22.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3967862 (HUNTER GORDON E, et al) [X] 1,7 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 2 * * column 6, line 1 - line 12 * * column 8, line 48 - line 64 * * figures 3,7,8; claim 1 * [Y] 9; | [A]EP0125659 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figures 20,21; claim 1 *; | [A]US4554990 (KAMIYA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 9; claim 1 *; | [A]US4733760 (INAGAKI TAKAFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* figure 8; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0354790 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * claim 1 *; | [X]GB2343428 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08182118 |