EP1760667 - Biometric identification device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Ken A. P.O. Box 7599 Loveland, CO 80537-0599 / US | 02 /
Wenstrand, John S. P.O. Box 7599 Loveland, CO 80537-0599 / US | 03 /
Panotopoulos, Georgios P.O. Box 7599 Loveland, CO 80537-0599 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002153.2 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | US20050210545 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: US 210545 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760667 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760667 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G07C9/00, H04L9/32 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G07C9/26 (EP,US);
G07F7/1016 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2008/19] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biometrische Identifikationseinrichtung | [2007/10] | English: | Biometric identification device | [2007/10] | French: | Dispositif d'identification biométrique | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 29.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/36] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4243908 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 60 ** column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 26 *; | [X]WO9926372 (DIGITAL PERSONA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - line 22 * * page 5, line 5 - page 8, line 23 *; | [X]WO0065770 (VERIDICOM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 31 * * page 12, line 4 - page 14, line 19 * * page 16, line 26 - page 19, line 10 * * figures 2-5 *; | [X]WO02065693 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * page 3, line 7 - line 28 * * page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 29 * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO02073877 (BRANDYS PASCAL [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 25 * |