EP1688936 - Optical pickup and optical disk apparatus incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2009 [2009/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanabe, Noritaka c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002160.7 | 02.02.2006 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | JP20050025960 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: JP 2005025960 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688936 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688936 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, H01S5/024 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G11B7/127 (EP,US);
G11B7/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/22 (EP,US);
H01S5/02212 (EP,US);
H01S5/02469 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Lesekopf und zugehöriges Laufwerk | [2007/32] | English: | Optical pickup and optical disk apparatus incorporating the same | [2006/32] | French: | Capture optique et appareil de disque optique lýincorporant | [2007/32] |
Former [2006/32] | Optische Lesekopfvorrichtung und optisches Plattengerät damit | ||
Former [2006/32] | Capture optique et appareil de disque optique l'incorporant | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002150589 ; | [X]JP2003187477 ; | [A]JP2004355754 ; | [A]EP1282206 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US6707073 (YAMAMOTO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]EP1408489 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2004218501 (SOGAWA TERUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0051]; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020904), vol. 2002, no. 09, & JP2002150589 A 20020524 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003187477 A 20030704 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004355754 A 20041216 (SHARP CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |