EP1701298 - Textile data carrier and fabrication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRA Gesellschaft für Asset Management mbH & Co. KG Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stobbe, Anatoli Steinradweg 3 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Körner, Peter Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Körner, Peter Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 06002335.5 | 06.02.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | DE20051010841 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005010841 | [2006/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1701298 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1701298 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/02 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/027 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
H01Q1/27 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
Y10T442/339 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/08] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Textilinformationsträger und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Textilinformationsträgers | [2006/37] | English: | Textile data carrier and fabrication method | [2006/37] | French: | Support d'informations textile et procédé de fabrication d'un support d'informations textile | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9828722 (BUENGER BOB TEXTIL [DE], et al) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * claims 1-6 ** claims 8,9,11 *; | [Y]WO0200993 (MEMMINGER IRO GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-40 * page 2, lines 8-19 * * page 3, lines 22-25 *; | [A]US2002189750 (BLECKMANN FREDERICK [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]WO03010712 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-40 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 16 * * page 10; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO0200993 | WO03101712 |