EP1710185 - Pocket folding machine with extractable pocket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenbau Oppenweiler Binder GmbH & Co. KG Grabenstrasse 4 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrbach, Jörg Gothaweg 11 71672 Marbach / DE | 02 /
Krieger, Eberhard Lindenstrasse 11 71384 Weinstadt-Strümpfelbach / DE | 03 /
Redmer, Claus-Dieter Rohrbachweg 1 71570 Oppenweiler / DE | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [2006/41] | Application number, filing date | 06002426.2 | 06.02.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | DE20052005532U | 07.04.2005 Original published format: DE 202005005532 U | [2006/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710185 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1710185 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/14 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B65H45/144 (EP,US);
B65H2402/32 (EP,US);
B65H2601/321 (EP,US);
B65H2601/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2007/25] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Taschenfalzmaschine mit Falztaschenkassette | [2006/41] | English: | Pocket folding machine with extractable pocket | [2006/41] | French: | Plieuse à poches avec poche extractible | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 12.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2552215 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG) [A] 1-3 * page 3 - page 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5000432 (KRASUSKI MAREK [FR], et al) [A] 1-3* column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4123130 (BREHMER BUCHBINDEREIMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1193206 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE10158522 (PETRATTO GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1475335 (MASCHB OPPENWEILERBINDER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE3217711 |