EP1659821 - Method and system for group call service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm, Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diep, David 50 Avenue de Livry 93270 Sevran / FR | 02 /
Grilli, Francesco 4210 Palo Verde Road Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R G C Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06002808.1 | 28.06.2002 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | US20010895667 | 29.06.2001 Original published format: US 895667 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1659821 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659821 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
H04W76/45 (EP,US);
H04W4/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/21] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für Gruppenanrufdienst | [2006/21] | English: | Method and system for group call service | [2006/21] | French: | Procédé et système d'appel de groupe | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02749728.8 / EP1405421 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.04.2009 | BE | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | IT | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | IE | 28.06.2009 | LU | 28.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | ES | 12.07.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.06.2009 | ||
LU | 28.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/02] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 28.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
BE | 01.04.2009 | ||
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2290196 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-34 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 31 ** page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 12 *; | [X]WO0038439 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 18 * page 7, lines 5-16; figure 1 * * page 14, lines 16-18 - lines 22-25 * * page 15, lines 3,4 *; | [Y]US6178166 (WILSON TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [Y] 17 * abstract * * column 6, lines 15-21 * * column 2, lines 46-53 *; | [XY]WO0137453 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 5,10,25,27 * page 8, lines 20,21 * * page 3, lines 19-22 * * page 4, lines 6-20; figure 1 * * page 8, lines 10-17 * * page 4, lines 6-20; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 11-14 * * page 7, lines 1-8 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 3 * [Y] 2-4,6-9,11-16,19-21,23,24,26,28,31,33,34,1,22,29,30,32; | [A]EP1107560 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-34 * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0027] * * column 7, lines 2-6 * * paragraphs [0042] , [0052] * * figures 1A,1B,1C *; | [Y] - EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), "Technical Specification Group Core Network;Voice group call service (VGCS)-Stage 2 (Release 4) (3GPP TS 43.68 version 4.2.1)", EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARD, XX, XX, (200012), pages 1 - 64, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20021023), XP002217968 [Y] 1,17,22,29,30,32,2-4,6-9,11-16,19-21,23,24,26,28,31,33,34 * pages 34-35 * * page 9, paragraph 4.2.2.1 * * paragraph [11.3.1.1.3] * | Examination | WO9750266 | - ABSTRACT ARTICLE, "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Voice Group Call Service (VGCS) - Stage 2 (GSM 03.68 proposed version 5.3.0)", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (19000101), XP014025248 | by applicant | WO9750266 | WO0038439 | US6178166 | WO0137453 | EP1107560 |