EP1672476 - Touch panel, display device and method of producing touch panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Kahoru c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Muramatsu, Masayoshi c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Koji c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Toyoda, Akito c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
Ozaki, Masaaki c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 06 /
Uchida, Tsuneo c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2006/43] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
Mori, Kahoru c/o Denko Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-choo Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Muramatsu, Masayoshi c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Koji c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
04 /
Toyoda, Akito c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
05 /
Ozaki, Masaaki c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
Uchida, Tsuneo c/o Denso Corporation IPD 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
Former [2006/25] | 01 /
Mori, Kahoru c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | ||
02 /
Muramatsu, Masayoshi c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
03 /
Sato, Koji c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
04 /
Toyoda, Akito c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
05 /
Ozaki, Masaaki c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
Uchida, Tsuneo c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
07 /
Toyoda, Akito c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | |||
08 /
Uchida, Tsuneo c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003028.5 | 12.10.2001 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000313729 | 13.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000313729 | JP20000339036 | 07.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000339036 | JP20010076308 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001076308 | JP20010076309 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001076309 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1672476 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1672476 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, H01H11/00, H01H13/70, G02F1/1333, G09F9/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
G06F1/1601 (EP);
G06F1/182 (EP);
G06F3/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/25] | G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Berührungsbildschirm, Anzeigevorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren für Berührungsbildschirm | [2006/25] | English: | Touch panel, display device and method of producing touch panel | [2006/25] | French: | Ecran tactile, dispositif d'affichage et procédé de fabrication de l'écran tactile | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 19.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01974841.7 / EP1326161 | Divisional application(s) | EP07015974.4 / EP1850215 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10326153 ; | [Y]JPH11242561 ; | [Y]JPH0348333 ; | [Y]JPH10133817 ; | [Y]JPH11149342 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10326153 A 19981208 (MICRO GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO:KK; TECHNO PRINT KK) [Y] 1-31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11242561 A 19990907 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910521), vol. 015, no. 196, Database accession no. (P - 1203), & JP03048333 A 19910301 (HITACHI LTD; others: 01) [Y] 1-31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10133817 A 19980522 (TECHNO PRINT KK) [Y] 1-31 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11149342 A 19990602 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-31 * abstract * |