EP1661809 - Equipment to package rectangular bags with rigid corners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICA SPA Via Del Litografo, 7 40138 Bologna / IT | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapparini, Gino Via Croara 3/V 40068 Bologna / IT | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Stolmár & Partner, et al Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/35] | Motsch, Andreas, et al Motsch & Seitz Patentanwälte St.-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Beszédes, Stephan G. Patentanwalt Postfach 11 68 D-85201 Dachau / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003375.0 | 21.10.2003 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | IT2002BO00694 | 04.11.2002 Original published format: IT BO20020694 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661809 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1661809 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B9/22, B29C53/50, B65B59/00, B65B51/26, B65B51/18 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C53/50 (EP);
B29C65/305 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/133 (EP);
B29C66/135 (EP);
B29C66/431 (EP);
B29C66/4312 (EP);
B29C66/4322 (EP);
B29C66/49 (EP);
B29C66/81419 (EP);
B29C66/8161 (EP);
B29C66/8222 (EP);
B29C66/836 (EP);
B29C66/841 (EP);
B29C66/843 (EP);
B29C66/849 (EP);
B65B51/18 (EP);
B65B51/26 (EP);
B65B59/00 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US);
B65B59/02 (EP,US);
B65B9/2042 (EP);
B65B9/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | B65B9/22, B65B59/02, B29C53/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/22] | Title | German: | Ausrüstung zur Herstellung rechteckiger Verpackungsbeutel mit steifen Ecken | [2006/22] | English: | Equipment to package rectangular bags with rigid corners | [2006/22] | French: | Système pour former des emballages rectangulaires à coins rigides | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 21.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03751178.9 / EP1560752 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030751178) is 03.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2012/41] | 01.03.2013 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/04] | 12.07.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2013/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE19957891 (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1142786 (ROVEMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraph [0021]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP1167192 (MEGA PACKAGING AG O [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1167208 (MEGA PACKAGING AG O [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |