EP1718127 - Vehicle light heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue, Glenview Cook County Illinois 60026-1215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreth, Cary 161 Braintree Street Bloomingdale, Illinois 60108 / US | 02 /
Bulgajewski, Edward F. 31164 Oakview Drive Genoa, Illinois 60135 / US | 03 /
Arnold, Erik Hauptstrasse 12 69517 Gorxheimertal / DE | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg) Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06003457.6 | 21.02.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | US20050116794 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: US 116794 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1718127 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/00, H05B3/84, B60Q1/02 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0017 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0005 (EP,US);
F21S45/33 (EP,US);
F21S45/37 (EP,US);
F21S45/60 (EP,US);
F21V29/90 (EP,US);
H05B1/0213 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erhitzer für Kraftfahrzeugleuchte | [2006/44] | English: | Vehicle light heater | [2006/44] | French: | Elément de chauffage pour phare de véhicule | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2009 | 04.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10343015 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6601983 (RUNFOLA VINCENT A [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2001043477 (OTT ALFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2004070339 (SUDA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE10331835 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]FR2616206 (CIBIE PROJECTEURS [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10346270 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH WIESE [AT], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0859188 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]JPH08164788 ; | [X]US6254259 (KOBAYASHI SHOJI [JP]) [X] 1,20 * abstract * * column 11, line 26 - line 46 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08164788 A 19960625 (ICHIKOH IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |